Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II v. Perez-Neis
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Jay A Garcia-Gregory |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01530 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default |
Case Filed: | Jul 30, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 26, 2019 5:35 AM AST |
Defendant
Di Evana Perez-Neris
|
|
Plaintiff
Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 60 minutes ago |
Thursday, February 08, 2024 | ||
48 | 48
motion
In Compliance
Thu 02/08 7:55 PM
Motion In Compliance and Request for Other Remedies as to 47 Order on Motion In Compliance filed by Rafael Bras-Benitez on behalf of Roosevelt REO PR II Corp. Responses due by 2/22/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bras-Benitez, Rafael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Writ | ||
Thursday, February 01, 2024 | ||
47 | 47
order
Order on Motion In Compliance
Thu 02/01 12:33 PM
ORDER noted46 Motion in Compliance. Further Status Report due by 2/12/2024. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/1/2024. (LTE) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2024 | ||
46 | 46
motion
In Compliance
Thu 01/11 10:41 AM
Motion In Compliance with Order filed by Rafael Bras-Benitez on behalf of Roosevelt REO PR II Corp. Responses due by 1/25/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bras-Benitez, Rafael) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2023 | ||
45 | 45
order
Order on Informative Motion
Wed 10/11 6:25 PM
ORDER noted44 INFORMATIVE Motion. Further Status Report due by 1/11/2024. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/11/2023. (MQ) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2023 | ||
44 | 44
motion
Informative Motion
Wed 09/20 9:31 AM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Bankruptcy Status filed by Rafael Bras-Benitez on behalf of Roosevelt REO PR II Corp. Responses due by 10/4/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bras-Benitez, Rafael) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
43 | 43
order
Order on Motion In Compliance Order on Motion to Appear
Mon 07/10 3:40 PM
ORDER noted42 Motion In Compliance; noted42 Motion for Leave to Appear. Further Status Report due by 9/8/2023. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 7/10/2023. (LTE) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
42 | 42
motion
In Compliance Appear
Fri 06/30 3:16 PM
Motion In Compliance as to 41 Order,, Terminate Motions,, MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Rafael Bras-Benitez on behalf of Roosevelt REO PR II Corp. Responses due by 7/14/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bras-Benitez, Rafael) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2023 | ||
41 | 41
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 01/26 2:46 PM
ORDER NOTED.40 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding of New Bankruptcy Case. NOTED MOTION requesting Order and Writ Amended to set a side Post-Bankruptcy Events filed by Roosevelt REO PR II Corp. The case is hereby STAYED. Status Report due by 7/1/2023. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/26/2023.(su) |
|
Wednesday, August 24, 2022 | ||
40 | 40
motion
Informative Motion Requesting Order
Wed 08/24 11:44 AM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding of New Bankrupcy Case, MOTION requesting Order and Writ Amended to set a side Post-Bankruptcy Events filed by Agustin Fortuno-Fas on behalf of Roosevelt REO PR II Corp. Responses due by 9/7/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Fortuno-Fas, Agustin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Writ | ||
Wednesday, July 20, 2022 | ||
39 | 39
service
Writ Issued
Wed 07/20 8:27 AM
Writ to Set Aside Registration of Deed of Sale Issued. (Original and one certified copy sent to attorney Agustin Frotuno-Fas by regular mail.) (gav) |
|
Friday, July 15, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Writ
Fri 07/15 11:45 AM
ORDER granting36 Motion for Writ; finding as moot37 Motion for Writ. The Clerk of Court shall take notice. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 7/15/2022. (MQ) |
||
Thursday, January 13, 2022 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Writ
Thu 01/13 12:12 PM
Second MOTION for Writ to Set Aside Regisration of Deed of Sale filed by Agustin Fortuno-Fas on behalf of Roosevelt REO PR II Corp. Responses due by 1/27/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Fortuno-Fas, Agustin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Writ | ||
Tuesday, October 19, 2021 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 10/19 10:44 AM
MOTION MOTION REQUESTING ISSUANCE OF WRIT TO SET ASIDE REGISTRATION OF DEED OF SALE re31 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion to Appear, filed by Agustin Fortuno-Fas on behalf of Roosevelt REO PR II Corp. Responses due by 11/2/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fortuno-Fas, Agustin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 04, 2021 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order on Motion In Compliance
Fri 06/04 3:17 PM
ORDER noted33 Motion In Compliance. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 6/04/2021. (lir) |
|
34 | 34
order
Order on Motion In Compliance
Fri 06/04 3:15 PM
ORDER noted32 Motion In Compliance. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 06/04/2021. (lir) |
|
Tuesday, June 01, 2021 | ||
33 | 33
motion
In Compliance
Tue 06/01 12:29 PM
Motion In Compliance with Court Order filed by Agustin Fortuno-Fas on behalf of Roosevelt REO PR II Corp. Responses due by 6/15/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Fortuno-Fas, Agustin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit email translate | ||
32 | 32
motion
In Compliance
Tue 06/01 11:50 AM
Motion In Compliance with Court Order filed by Agustin Fortuno-Fas on behalf of Roosevelt REO PR II Corp. Responses due by 6/15/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Fortuno-Fas, Agustin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Foreclosure sale translation | ||
Monday, May 10, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Appear
Mon 05/10 3:05 PM
ORDER granting30 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; granting30 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 5/10/2021. (MQ) (rim) |
|
Att: 1 (5/10/2021) Main Document | ||
Friday, May 07, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Miscellaneous Relief Appear
Fri 05/07 4:22 PM
MOTION Requesting Various Remedies in Light of Defendant's Bankruptcy Filing filed by Agustin Fortuno-Fas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Fortuno-Fas, Agustin). Added MOTION for Leave to Appear on 5/7/2021 (mg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 21, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion for Confirmation of Sale
Wed 04/21 5:11 PM
ORDER finding as moot27 Motion for Confirmation of Sale. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 4/21/2021. (lir) |
|
Thursday, January 14, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Confirmation of Sale
Thu 01/14 6:04 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion for Confirmation of Sale. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/14/2021. (MQ) |
|
Thursday, October 22, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Confirmation of Sale
Thu 10/22 1:19 PM
MOTION for Confirmation of Sale Reiterating the request at Docket No. 26 filed by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of Roosevelt REO PR II Corp. Responses due by 11/5/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin) |
|
Friday, August 28, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Confirmation of Sale
Fri 08/28 12:59 PM
MOTION for Confirmation of Sale filed by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of Roosevelt REO PR II Corp. Responses due by 9/11/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Confirmation | ||
Monday, April 13, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for Confirmation of Sale
Mon 04/13 3:15 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice 23 Motion for Confirmation of Sale, pursuant to Misc. No. 20-88(GAG). Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 4/13/2020. (MQ) |
|
Friday, February 14, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 02/18 4:26 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion, Re:23 MOTION for Confirmation of Sale filed by Roosevelt REO PR II Corp. filed by Di Evana Perez-Neris, pro se. (mg) |
|
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Confirmation of Sale
Thu 01/23 12:57 PM
MOTION for Confirmation of Sale filed by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of Roosevelt REO PR II Corp. Responses due by 2/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Report
Wed 01/22 10:58 AM
REPORT OF SALE OF PROPERTY BY THE SPECIAL MASTER (AWARDED TO PLAINTIFF) by Pedro A. Velez-Baerga. (Velez-Baerga, Pedro) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Sale, Affidavit of Publication, Auction Records | ||
Tuesday, January 14, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Informative Motion
Tue 01/14 4:22 PM
ORDER noted20 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/14/2020. (lir) |
|
Monday, January 13, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Informative Motion
Mon 01/13 3:51 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding COMPLIANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. §2002 filed by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of Roosevelt REO PR II Corp. Responses due by 1/27/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice Of Sale, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Aff Publication Notice Of Sale, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit DJ Posteo, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit DJ Correo Certificado Notice Of Sale | ||
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Party
Thu 12/19 5:49 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 12/19/2019. (lir) |
|
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Substitute Party
Mon 12/16 1:28 PM
First MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II Responses due by 1/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Allonge | ||
Monday, September 30, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Execution of Judgment
Mon 09/30 4:06 PM
ORDER finding as moot14 Motion for Execution of Judgment. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 9/30/2019. (su) |
|
16 | 16
service
Writ Issued
Mon 09/30 4:04 PM
Writ of Execution of Judgment Issued as to Di Evana Perez-Neris. (su)(Original and A/C sent to Joaquin Lago) |
|
15 | 15
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Execution of Judgment
Mon 09/30 4:01 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Execution of Judgment. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 9/30/2019. (su) |
|
Monday, May 20, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Execution of Judgment
Mon 05/20 1:41 PM
MOTION for Execution of Judgment Motion Reiterating execution of Judgment filed by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II Responses due by 6/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Execution of Judgment
Mon 03/25 2:52 PM
MOTION for Execution of Judgment filed by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II Responses due by 4/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Writ | ||
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment - Default
Wed 02/27 3:12 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Di Evana Perez-Neris. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/27/2019. (MQ) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Wed 02/27 3:11 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Default Judgment. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/27/2019. (MQ) |
|
Friday, February 01, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Default -Judgment
Fri 02/01 11:42 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Di Evana Perez-Neris filed by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II Responses due by 2/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Fri 01/25 3:55 PM
ORDER. Motion for default judgment and proposed default judgment due by 2/1/2019. Any and all exhibits must be filed in English or accompanied by a certified English translation pursuant to 48 U.S.C. § 864 and Local Civil Rule 5(g). Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/25/2019. (MQ) |
|
Thursday, January 24, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Memorandum of the Clerk
Thu 01/24 3:03 PM
MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Chief Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi, this case has been randomly reassigned to the docket of Jay A. Garcia-Gregory, who has consented to said transfer. Signed by Clerk on 1/24/2019. (ft) |
|
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Mon 11/05 12:57 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Di Evana Perez-Neris. (gav) |
|
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Fri 11/02 12:52 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Entry of Default Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/29/2018. (EES) |
|
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Default - Entry
Fri 10/05 1:44 PM
MOTION for Default Entry as to Di Evana Perez-Neris filed by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II Responses due by 10/19/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 09/10 2:32 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II upon Di Evana Perez-Neris served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. (Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/31 10:54 AM
Summons Issued as to Di Evana Perez-Neis (arg) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Tue 07/31 9:32 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/30 2:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Di Evana Perez-Neis ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5981385.), filed by Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II. Service due by 10/29/2018,(Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Category Sheet |