Martinez v. USA
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Theresa L Springmann |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00232 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | May 01, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2022 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, May 16, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 05/16 12:07 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to10 Notice of Appeal filed by Eduardo Martinez. The request for a certificate of appealability is DENIED. Martinezs motion to appoint counsel is DENIED. No district court records to be returned.(sej) |
|
Att: 1 Certified Order | ||
Friday, September 16, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 09/19 3:42 PM
USCA Case Number 22-2641 for10 Notice of Appeal filed by Eduardo Martinez. (sej) |
|
13 | 13
appeal
Short Record Sent to USCA
Fri 09/16 11:06 AM
Short Record Sent to US Court of Appeals re10 Notice of Appeal. No appeal fees paid. (ash) |
|
Thursday, September 15, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Transcript Request
Fri 09/16 10:12 AM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Eduardo Martinez for proceedings held on July 29, 2022 before Judge Theresa L. Springmann, re10 Notice of Appeal,11 Docketing Statement Transcript due by 10/17/2022. (Yarbro, Peter) (ash) |
|
11 | 11
appeal
Docketing Statement
Fri 09/16 10:01 AM
Docketing Statement re:10 Notice of Appeal filed by Eduardo Martinez. (Yarbro, Peter) (ash) |
|
10 | 10
appeal
Notice of Appeal - court user
Fri 09/16 10:00 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to8 Opinion and Order and9 Clerks Judgment by Eduardo Martinez. (Yarbro, Peter) (ash) |
|
Monday, August 01, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Clerks Judgment
Mon 08/01 3:07 PM
AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (sej) |
|
Friday, July 29, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
16
pgs
order
Opinion and Order
Fri 07/29 12:24 PM
AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER: the Court hereby DENIES the Defendants Motion Under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody 308 , and the Defendants Motion to Hold in Abeyance a Motion to Vacate Sentence Filed Under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 318 . Further, the Court DENIES a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 07/29/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(sej) |
|
Tuesday, July 26, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Clerks Judgment
Tue 07/26 4:21 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (sej) |
|
6 | 6
16
pgs
order
Opinion and Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Tue 07/26 4:19 PM
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES the Defendants Motion Under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody [ECF No. 308] (in docket 1:15-cr-1). Further, the Court DENIES a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 07/26/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(sej) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 07/11 3:36 PM
Judge Holly A Brady no longer assigned to case. (rs) |
||
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 06/19 11:21 AM
Mail Returned from Eduardo Martinez as Undeliverable -2 Order Reassigning Case - Unable to forward. Due to DE 4 will be sending to new address listed for Petitioner. (mrm) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 06/18 9:13 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address from Pollock FCI to Oakdale FDC pursuant to criminal case 1:15-cr-1 (Order Reassigning Case DE1 was sent from criminal case to Oakdale address and not returned) (nae) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 06/17 11:55 AM
Mail Returned from Eduardo Martinez as Undeliverable as addressed - Unable to Forward1 Order Reassigning Case. (mrm) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 06/06 9:16 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: This action is reassigned from the docket of Judge Holly A. Brady to Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 6/5/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(bas) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
5
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 05/01 12:14 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Holly A Brady for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/1/19. (cc: Eduardo Martinez).(cer) |