Valfre, LLC v. Shein Fashion Group, Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-06659 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 02, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 21, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 29, 2019 12:27 AM PST |
Defendant
Shein Fashion Group, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Valfre, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Wed 11/21 1:27 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) Mailed copies to the Register of Copyrights. (gk) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Stipulation for Dismissal | ||
21 | 21
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 11/21 9:34 AM
Corrected STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Valfre, LLC.(Burroughs, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Wed 11/21 7:48 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: Stipulation filed 11/19/201818 . The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by immediately. (gk) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Tue 11/20 10:51 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case18 . The following error(s) was/were found: On page 2, the Stipulation is signed by, "Attorneys for Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc." In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) |
|
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 11/19 3:14 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Valfre, LLC.(Burroughs, Scott) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Mon 10/15 3:15 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 10/12 6:22 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Shein Fashion Group, Inc, identifying Shein Fashion Group, Inc., ZoeTop Business Co. Limited, Shein Group Limited. (Ho, Valerie) |
|
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 10/12 6:17 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Shein Fashion Group, Inc.(Attorney Valerie W Ho added to party Shein Fashion Group, Inc(pty:dft))(Ho, Valerie) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 09/25 9:27 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) |
|
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program
Fri 09/21 1:14 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:18-cv-06659 AB(JPRx). (rn) |
|
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program
Thu 09/20 6:36 PM
DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Shein Fashion Group, Inc. (Valentina, Elizabeth) |
|
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 09/20 6:03 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Shein Fashion Group, Inc answer now due 10/12/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Shein Fashion Group, Inc.(Attorney Elizabeth Valentina added to party Shein Fashion Group, Inc(pty:dft))(Valentina, Elizabeth) |
|
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final
Thu 09/06 2:48 PM
STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Valfre, LLC. (Burroughs, Scott) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form
Thu 09/06 2:18 PM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (dml) |
|
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 08/24 9:50 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Valfre, LLC, upon Defendant Shein Fashion Group, Inc served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jonathan Lin, Agent for Service of Process c/o Hen Chang, Receptionist Authorized to Receive in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 08/03 11:57 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Shein Fashion Group, Inc. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form
Fri 08/03 11:47 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh) |
|
Att: 1 CV-11C | ||
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Thu 08/02 4:10 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Valfre, LLC. (Burroughs, Scott) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Thu 08/02 4:09 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Valfre, LLC. (Burroughs, Scott) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 08/02 4:09 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Valfre, LLC. (Burroughs, Scott) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 08/02 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Valfre, LLC, (Burroughs, Scott) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 08/02 4:06 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22193300 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Valfre, LLC. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Valfre, LLC(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott) |