Member Case
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:18-bk-11802
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
National Stores, Inc.
15001 S Figueroa St
Gardena, CA 90248-1721
Represented By
Peter J. Keane
Pachulski Stang Young & Jones LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801

Docket last updated: 71 minutes ago
Thursday, November 15, 2018
9 9 misc Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity Thu 10:31 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, , Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. /Amended Schedule B and D of National Stores, Inc. [Case No. 18-11802 Filed by National Stores, Inc.. (Keane, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 18, 2018
8 8 misc Schedules/Statements Tue 11:10 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. of National Stores, Inc. Filed by National Stores, Inc.. (Keane, Peter)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Schedules/Statements Tue 11:09 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. of National Stores, Inc. Filed by National Stores, Inc.. (Keane, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 17, 2018
6 6 utility Corrective Entry Mon 1:41 PM
Corrective Entry - Letter was docketed in the jointly admin case instead of the Lead bk 18-11801 Related [+] (NAB)
Related: [-] 5
5 5 misc Letter (Bk) Mon 1:33 PM
[ENTERED IN ERROR] Letter Regarding being the voice or representative for the Committee. Filed by Dennis Slapo . (NAB) Modified on 9/17/2018 (NAB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 07, 2018
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 6:44 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases of J & M Sales Inc., Case No. 18-11801 (LSS), National Stores, Inc., Case No. 18-11802 (LSS), J&M Sales of Texas, LLC, Case No. 18-11803 (LSS), FP Stores, Inc., Case No. 18-11804 (LSS), Southern Island Stores, LLC, Case No. 18-11805 (LSS), Southern Island Retail Stores LLC, Case No. 18-11806 (LSS), Caribbean Island Stores, LLC, Case No. 18-11807 (LSS), Pazzo FNB Corp., Case No. 18-11808 (LSS), Fallas Stores Holdings, Inc., Case No. 18-11809 (LSS) and Pazzo Management LLC, Case No. 18-11810 (LSS). The docket in the Chapter 11 case of J & M Sales Inc., Case No. 18-11801 (LSS), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 8/7/2018 (Mml)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd none Tue 10:13 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-11802 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8967059, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 06, 2018
2 2 notice Appearance - Notice Mon 3:12 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by SulmeyerKupetz, A Professional Corporation. (Sahn, Victor)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 3:13 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by National Stores, Inc.. (Keane, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Creditor Matrix
court Case Assigned Mon 8:33 AM
Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case (BA)
Related: [-]