Messier v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Carlos E Mendoza |
Referred: | Karla R Spaulding |
Case #: | 6:18-cv-01280 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement |
Case Filed: | Aug 06, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 02, 2019 3:16 AM EST |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julia Messier
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order dismissing case
Thu 12/20 3:48 PM
ORDER dismissing case with prejudice subject to the right of any party, within sixty days from the date of this Order, to move the Court to enter a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or, on good cause shown, to reopen the case for further proceedings. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to close this file - re 23 Notice of settlement. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/20/2018. (DJD) |
|
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of settlement
Wed 12/19 11:56 AM
NOTICE of settlement by Julia Messier (Dabdoub, Edward) |
|
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of mediation conference/hearing
Tue 10/30 3:25 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 1/3/19, 1:00 p.m. before A. Michelle Jernigan. (Jernigan, Anna) |
|
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
utility
Case Referred to Mediation
Wed 10/24 12:01 PM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (LMM) |
|
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Case management and scheduling order
Tue 10/23 2:08 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER FOR A CLAIM-REVIEW CASE FILED UNDER E.R.I.S.A.: Deadline for filing of the administrative record: December 13, 2018; Deadline for filing of Plaintiff's opening brief: March 14, 2019; Deadline for filing of Defendant's brief: April 15, 2019; Deadline for filing of Plaintiff's reply brief: May 14, 2019; Conduct mediation hearing by 1/25/2019. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/23/2018. (DJD) |
|
Friday, October 19, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Case Management Report
Fri 10/19 3:21 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Dabdoub, Edward) |
|
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 10/19 9:19 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Lehner, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 10/10 3:38 PM
ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 10/10/2018. (RDO) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 10/10 10:11 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to October 20, 2018, to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Lehner, Steven) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 10/10/2018 (SPM) |
|
utility
Set/reset deadlines/hearings-PUBLIC
Thu 10/11 9:48 AM
Set/reset deadlines: for Life Insurance Company of North America. Answer due by 10/22/2018. (SPM) |
||
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 09/19 2:54 PM
ORDER granting 14 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Answer or response due 10/10/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 9/19/2018. (ECJ) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 09/19 12:49 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to October 10, 2018, to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Lehner, Steven) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 9/19/2018 (SPM) |
|
utility
Set/reset deadlines/hearings-PUBLIC
Thu 09/20 10:54 AM
Reset deadlines: for Life Insurance Company of North America. Answer due by 10/10/2018. (SPM) |
||
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Thu 08/30 10:59 AM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Life Insurance Company of North America. Related case(s): no (Lehner, Steven) |
|
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 08/30 10:59 AM
ORDER granting 9 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Answer or response due by 9/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 8/30/2018. (ECJ) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Thu 08/30 10:58 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re10 Interested persons order by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent CIGNA Corporation, Corporate Parent Cigna Holdings, Inc. for Life Insurance Company of North America.. (Lehner, Steven) |
|
10 | 10
order
Interested persons order
Thu 08/30 10:18 AM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by defendant by 9/13/2018. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/30/2018. (DJD) |
|
utility
Set/reset deadlines/hearings-PUBLIC
Thu 08/30 11:10 AM
Set/reset deadlines: for Life Insurance Company of North America. Answer due by 9/20/2018. (SPM) |
||
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 08/29 4:39 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Lehner, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Tue 08/21 4:22 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re4 Interested persons order by Julia Messier. (Dabdoub, Edward) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Tue 08/21 4:18 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Julia Messier. Related case(s): no (Dabdoub, Edward) |
|
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons returned executed
Tue 08/14 2:18 PM
RETURN of service executed on 8/10/2018 by Julia Messier as to Life Insurance Company of North America.(Dabdoub, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Main Document Proof of Service | ||
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Proof of service
Mon 08/13 5:27 PM
PROOF of service by Julia Messier(Dabdoub, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Main Document Proof of Service | ||
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
Interested persons order
Fri 08/10 2:05 PM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/24/2018. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/10/2018. (DJD) |
|
3 | 3
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Fri 08/10 2:04 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant to prepare the attached proposed scheduling order for use by the parties in preparing the deadlines for case management. The Proposed Scheduling Order shall be filed within fourteen (14) days after their case management conference. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/24/2018. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/10/2018. (DJD) |
|
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons issued
Wed 08/08 10:20 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (SPM) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 08/08 10:19 AM
COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $400 receipt number ORL075825) filed by Julia Messier.(SPM) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |