Spottedbear et al v. Sheahan et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | Carla Baldwin Carry |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-00374 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 05, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 04, 2019 1:00 AM PST |
Defendant
Facebook Website
|
|
Defendant
Reno Justice Court
|
|
Defendant
Second Judicial District Court
|
|
Defendant
Monique Settwongse
|
|
Defendant
Sean Sheahan
|
|
Defendant
Tinder Adult Site
|
|
Defendant
Washoe County Sheriff's Office
|
|
Defendant
William
|
|
Plaintiff
Jared Spottedbear
550 West Plumb Lane. Ste B109
Reno, NV 89512 |
|
Plaintiff
Joann Spottedbear
550 West Plumb Lane, Ste B109
Reno, NV 89512 |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
order
Judgment
Thu 09/05 8:50 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 9/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) |
|
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Report and Recommendation Order Dismissing Case
Thu 09/05 8:50 AM
ORDER that the Report and Recommendation (ECF No.17 ) is adopted in full ; Plaintiffs' first amended complaint (ECF No.12 ) is dismissed with prejudice and without leave to amend; Plaintiffs' pending motion (ECF No.13 ) is denied as moot ; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
minord
Minute Order
Fri 08/16 3:57 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 8/16/2019. It has come to the court's attention that a juvenile, M.S., has been named as a defendant. M.S. is an alleged victim of a sexual crime who is named repeatedly in papers filed in this case. Therefore, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2, the Clerk shall seal the following documents in this case: ECF No.1 ,4 ,6 ,7 ,8 ,9 ,10 ,12 , &13 . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Report and Recommendation
Fri 08/16 4:05 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (ECF No.1 2) be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Clerk ENTER JUDGMENT and close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 8/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 8/16/2019 to correct file date(DRM) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 06/04 3:14 PM
ORDER re a letter dated May 29, 2019, from non-parties Joseph Barton and Paula Gloria Barton (ECF No.14 ). The Court will take no action in connection with the May 29, 2019 letter, other than to order that the Clerk unseal the letter on the docket. The Clerk is also instructed to mail a copy of this order to the Bartons at the address listed in their letter. ( Mailed to the Bartons on 6/4/2019 ). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) |
|
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Motion Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 05/08 8:26 AM
MOTION re Jered Lee Spotted Bear, by Plaintiff Joann Spottedbear. Responses due by 5/22/2019. (DRM) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Complaint Amended
Fri 03/22 3:20 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT/Response re ECF No.9 Order, by Joann Spottedbear. Proof of service due by 6/20/2019.(DRM) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Exhibit
Mon 03/18 2:56 PM
EXHIBIT - Copy of Letters, with attachments, filed by Plaintiff Joann Spottedbear. (DRM) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/13 12:56 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Joann Spottedbear, Jared Spottedbear. (Filed and dismissed with leave to amend pursuant to ECF No.9 Order.)(DRM) |
|
9 | 9
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Report and Recommendation ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Wed 03/13 12:45 PM
ORDER the Report and Recommendation (ECF No.8 ) is accepted and adopted in its entirety. Plaintiffs' IFP application (ECF No.1 ) is granted . Clerk shall detach and file Plaintiffs' Complaint (ECF No.1 - 1). The Complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to the following Defendants: the Reno Justice Court, the Second Judicial District, Facebook, and Tinder. The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend as to claims against the following Defendants: the Washoe County Sheriff's Office, Sean Sheahan, and Monique Settwongse. Clerk shall send Plaintiffs a copy of the civil rights complaint form. (1983 form mailed to each Plaintiff on 3/13/2019.) Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint, no longer than 20 pages, by 4/12/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Report and Recommendation
Tue 02/26 1:08 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that ECF No.1 IFP Application be GRANTED; that P's complaint be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE WITH/WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND as to the specified Defendants herein; that Clerk send Ps a complaint form; and that P's Amended Complaint be due within 30 days from service of District Court's order on this R&R. Objections to R&R due by 3/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 2/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice Other
Fri 11/16 3:23 PM
NOTICE - Document addressed to Reno Justice Court, filed by Jared Spottedbear, Joann Spottedbear. (DRM) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice Other
Tue 09/25 8:36 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Joann Spottedbear. (KR) |
|
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Clerks Notice Reassign Judge
Wed 08/29 10:11 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:18-cv-00374-MMD-CBC . (no image attached) (DRM) |
|
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Exhibit
Wed 08/22 3:14 PM
EXHIBIT to ECF No.1 -1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Jared Spottedbear, Joann Spottedbear. ( Un-Imageable Photographs. Clerk placed in manual filing cabinet in Clerk's filing room under case number ).(KW) |
|
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice Other
Tue 08/14 11:41 AM
NOTICE, filed by Jared Spottedbear. (KW) |
|
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas
Thu 08/09 7:35 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigants. (DRM) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/9/2018) (DRM) |
|
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 08/09 7:26 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiffs Jared Spottedbear, Joann Spottedbear. (Complaint, which includes personal identifier documents, attached separately Under Seal pending chambers review.) (DRM) (DRM) |
|
Att: 1 (8/9/2018) Complaint | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Wed 08/08 3:46 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ) |