Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 107.214.106.117
California Central District Court | |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-06865 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 10, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 05, 2019 12:25 AM PST |
Defendant
John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 107.214.106.117
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
transfer
Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form
Fri 08/10 3:06 PM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to clerical error. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been reassigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. New Case Number 8:18-cv-01427-CJC-KESx. (car) |
|
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Thu 08/09 6:53 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/09 6:51 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying General Media Systems, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 08/09 6:50 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, identifying General Media Systems, LLC (Corporate Parent) And John Doe (Defendant). (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 08/09 6:49 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 08/09 6:48 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22231921 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attorney Lincoln D Bandlow added to party Strike 3 Holdings, LLC(pty:pla))(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |