Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Terry J Hatter, Jr |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 8:18-cv-01417 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 12, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 05, 2019 12:49 AM PST |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, March 12, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Tue 03/12 10:25 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. Mailed closing report to the current address of the Copyright Office: U.S. Copyright Office 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (Closing) (shb) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Dismissal | ||
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 03/11 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Dismissal is Without Prejudice of John Doe Subscriber Assigned IP Address 45.48.37.4. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Extension of Time to File
Fri 11/16 4:17 PM
ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: GRANTING12 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant. ORDER AND ADJUDGE: Plaintiffs application is granted. Plaintiff shall have until March 15, 2019 to effectuate service of a summons and Complaint on Defendant. (shb) |
|
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 11/07 4:42 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File For Extension Of Time Within Which To Effectuate Service On John Doe Defendant filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Leave
Wed 09/19 3:51 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Order Granting Plaintiffs Application for Leave to TakeEarly Discovery10 (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Leave
Wed 09/12 5:49 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(F) Conference filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-D Declarations In Support, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 08/29 4:26 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS)NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. (see document for further details) (yl) |
|
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)
Fri 08/24 8:43 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: EDCV18-00787 TJH(SPx). Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV18-01417 TJH(SPx). Signed by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. (lwag) |
|
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 08/10 11:03 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 08/10 11:02 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et) |
|
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Thu 08/09 8:43 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/09 8:42 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying General Media Systems, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 08/09 8:41 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, identifying General Media Systems, LLC (Corporate Parent) And John Doe (Defendant). (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 08/09 8:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 08/09 8:40 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22232065 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attorney Lincoln D Bandlow added to party Strike 3 Holdings, LLC(pty:pla))(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit A |