Eastern Profit Corporation Limited v. Strategic Vision US LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lewis J Liman |
Referred: | Debra C Freeman |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-02185 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 30, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 08, 2018 4:49 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
Strategic Vision US LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Eastern Profit Corporation Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Strategic Vision US LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eastern Profit Corporation Limited
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
DEF
Terminated: 08/09/2018
|
|
Plaintiff
ABC
Terminated: 08/09/2018
|
1. | Chinese Tycoon Holed Up in Manhattan Hotel Is Accused of Spying for Beijing (wsj.com) |
Submitted Mon 07/22/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, November 05, 2021 | ||
misc
Certification of Judgment
Fri 11/05 1:40 PM
CERTIFICATION OF JUDGMENT issued on November 5, 2021, in favor of Eastern Profit Corporation Limited and against Strategic Vision US, LLC in the amount of $1,000,000, plus post-judgment interest in the amount of $2.47 per day beginning June 30, 2021. Certification of judgment mailed by the Court.(km) |