United States of America v. Money Shinday et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Christina A Snyder |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-06891 |
Nature of Suit | 870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant) |
Cause | 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 10, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 06, 2019 12:55 AM PST |
Defendant
Money Shinday
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nila Shinday
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, December 20, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 12/20 4:29 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS CASE24 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: This case is dismissed without prejudice. All pending scheduling dates are vacated. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 12/19 2:11 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to By Reason of Settlement filed by Plaintiff United States of America.(Ellis, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Case | ||
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
Thu 10/03 12:37 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Steven R. Sauer has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb) |
|
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
minutes
Scheduling Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 06/05 11:29 AM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Christina A. Snyder.The Court confers with counsel and schedules the following dates: Request for leave to file amended pleadings or to add parties: August 1, 2019; Settlement Completion Cutoff: December 16, 2019; Factual Discovery Cut-off: December 2, 2019; Last Day to File Motions: January 6, 2020; Status Conference re: Settlement (11:00 A.M.): January 6, 2020; Pretrial Conference/Hearing on Motions in Limine (11:00 A.M.): March 16, 2020; and Jury Trial (9:30 A.M.): March 31, 2020. ( SEE DOCUMENT FOR OTHER SPECIFICS). Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (lc) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)
Wed 06/05 11:07 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 12/16/19. Status Conference set for 1/6/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (lc) |
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Wed 05/22 10:14 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2 days, filed by Plaintiff United States of America.. (Ellis, John) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
6
pgs
order
Order
Tue 05/07 8:52 AM
Non-Waiver ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick, re Stipulation for Order18 . (sp) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
3
pgs
stip
Order
Thu 05/02 3:22 PM
STIPULATION for Order Stipulated Request for Non-Waiver Order filed by plaintiff United States of America.(Ellis, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 04/11 3:24 PM
MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Christina A. Snyder: This matter is set for a Scheduling Conference on June 3, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. The Scheduling Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ.P 16(b). The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the date of the Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and to report to the Court not later than 14 days after they confer on a discovery plan and the other matters required by F.R.Civ.P. 26(f) and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Judge Snyder is located at 350 West First Street, in Courtroom 8D, on the eighth floor. See order for further details. (shb) |
|
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 12/19 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Money Shinday, Nila Shinday, identifying United States of America. (Bautista, Ismael) |
|
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Tue 12/18 10:07 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): No certificate of interested party on file to date. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) |
|
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 12/17 2:41 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by DEFENDANTS Money Shinday, Nila Shinday.(Bautista, Ismael) |
|
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
minutes
Motion Hearing
Tue 12/04 4:40 PM
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: RE: DEFENDANTS MONEY SHINDAY AND NILA SHINDAYS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT10 . The Court DENIES defendants motion to dismiss the governments claim. Court Reporter: Lisa Gonzalez. (lc). Modified on 12/4/2018. (lc) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Tue 11/13 4:03 PM
Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiff United States of America re: Notice (Other)10 (Ellis, John) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Mon 10/15 5:45 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other)10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Motion: Dismiss Case (follow prompts to select date, time and Judge). Other error(s) with document(s): Due to incorrect event, No Motion was set for hearing. Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 10/12 11:03 AM
NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM filed by DEFENDANTS Money Shinday, Nila Shinday.(Bautista, Ismael) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 09/26 11:44 AM
Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Nila Shinday, Money Shinday.(Attorney Ismael Bautista, Jr added to party Money Shinday(pty:dft), Attorney Ismael Bautista, Jr added to party Nila Shinday(pty:dft))(Bautista, Ismael) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 09/11 3:17 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Money Shinday answer now due 9/27/2018; Nila Shinday answer now due 9/27/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff United States of America.(Ellis, John) |
|
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 08/24 12:48 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 08/13 8:32 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Money Shinday, Nila Shinday. (car) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 08/13 8:30 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 08/13 8:30 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car) |
|
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 08/10 3:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Ellis, John) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Fri 08/10 3:39 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Ellis, John) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 08/10 3:36 PM
COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney John Ellis added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Ellis, John) |