Kinkle et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Colm F Connolly |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-01241 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 29, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 10, 2019 3:24 AM EST |
Defendant
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
|
|
Defendant
Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Rogers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Monica Phipps
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wilma R. Robinson Scott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marilyn Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Roberds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricardo Resto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Reither
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debbie Pyatok
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Proska
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dusty Price
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darlene Powell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sam Ponce
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Pinto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Megan Pinnell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra D. Pinion
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Josh Piasecki
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paula Oyola
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley L. Shinn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clara Sosa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Valerie R. Snyder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda A. Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aaminah Nicole Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carolyn B. Sinclair
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Simon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dawn E. Siewert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Rohrman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Taylor Sharp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jesus Ayon Seoane
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fabian Ray Scott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Dawn Saunders
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Santeyan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vincent Sanders
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joan Runge
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Ruffin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frankie Rudolph
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Willie Lee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Melfi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon G. Meade
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerard McMillan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda D. McKee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathy J. McCaulley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Mathison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mario Lungelow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Lucero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Douglas Lott, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Midgette
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Calvin Lee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy Leaks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Denitta Lawson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerine Lawler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Devik Law
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Kuszaj
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wendy Kruszewski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Kinkle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Murphy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maetajia Peoples
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carrie Ostenson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John D. Orcutt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael J. Onorato
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Noles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Nicholas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua P. Newman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darlene Newman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brenda L. Myers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frances Phillips
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clayton Mounts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dana L. Moschella
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan Moreno
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robin Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Earline Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carrie A. Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keisha Montgomery
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tryphena Monds
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
utility
Remark
Thu 08/30 10:07 AM
Remark : Case transferred from Delaware has been opened in Northern District of Florida as case 3:18-cv-02068, filed 08/30/2018. (rwc) |
||
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/29 2:59 PM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (nmf) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District
Wed 08/29 3:19 PM
Case transferred to the Northern District of Florida under case no. 3:18-cv-2068 in accordance with the conditional transfer order. (nmf) |
||
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/17 3:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Kinkle. Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (Hrubiec, R.) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/17 3:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Kinkle. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (Hrubiec, R.) |
|
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/15 12:01 PM
Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Bristol-Myers Squibb Company on 8/15/2018; Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. on 8/15/2018; Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. on 8/15/2018. (crb) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 08/15 3:30 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01238-CFC, 1:18-cv-01241-CFC, 1:18-cv-01242-CFC, 1:18-cv-01243-CFC(rjb) |
||
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Magistrate Consent Forms
Tue 08/14 2:55 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmf) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 08/14 2:54 PM
COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc., Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2439489.) - filed by Jesus Ayon Seoane, Sharon G. Meade, Anthony Nicholas, Raymond Lucero, Carrie Ostenson, Devik Law, Vincent Sanders, Jason Reither, Fabian Ray Scott, Keith Murphy, Kathy J. McCaulley, Linda Proska, Brenda L. Myers, Joshua P. Newman, Eric Ruffin, Stephanie Rogers, Joshua Roberds, Sam Ponce, Gerard McMillan, Frankie Rudolph, Lisa Melfi, Denitta Lawson, Darlene Powell, Wilma R. Robinson Scott, Lisa Pinto, Dusty Price, Frances Phillips, Dawn E. Siewert, John Noles, Linda D. McKee, Clara Sosa, Jennifer Dawn Saunders, Tryphena Monds, Debbie Pyatok, Keisha Montgomery, Calvin Lee, Carolyn B. Sinclair, Josh Piasecki, Ricardo Resto, Paula Oyola, Earline Moore, James Douglas Lott, Jr, Michael J. Onorato, Aaminah Nicole Smith, Taylor Sharp, Willie Lee, Elizabeth Kinkle, Linda A. Smith, Valerie R. Snyder, Angela Mathison, Maetajia Peoples, Debra D. Pinion, Anthony Simon, Darlene Newman, John D. Orcutt, Steven Smith, Susan Moreno, Ashley L. Shinn, Clayton Mounts, Michael Smith, Monica Phipps, Anthony Santeyan, Mario Lungelow, Randy Leaks, Marilyn Robinson, Megan Pinnell, Wendy Kruszewski, Dana L. Moschella, Jerine Lawler, John Rohrman, Robin Moore, James Midgette, Carrie A. Moore, Joan Runge, Linda Kuszaj.(nmf) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
service
No Summons Issued
Tue 08/14 2:55 PM
No Summons Issued. (nmf) |