Gershak v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | James S Moody, Jr |
Referred: | Julie S Sneed |
Case #: | 8:18-cv-01986 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement |
Case Filed: | Aug 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 09, 2019 3:59 AM EST |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Jack L. Townsend, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Gershak
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order
Thu 05/23 4:54 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 19 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. This case is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 5/23/2019. (SMB) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 05/23 2:04 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Michael Gershak. (Kimsey, Paul) |
|
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of settlement
Mon 05/13 9:36 AM
NOTICE of settlement by Michael Gershak (Kimsey, Paul) |
|
Friday, May 10, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order dismissing case
Fri 05/10 4:06 PM
60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 16 Notice of Settlement. All pending motions, if any, are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 5/10/2019. (SMB) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of settlement
Fri 05/10 3:30 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Life Insurance Company of North America (Lehner, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/19 3:30 PM
NOTICE by Life Insurance Company of North America re12 Case management and scheduling order Filing Redacted Administrative Record(Lehner, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Main Document, | ||
Att: 2 Main Document, | ||
Att: 3 Main Document, | ||
Att: 4 Main Document, | ||
Att: 5 Main Document, | ||
Att: 6 Main Document, | ||
Att: 7 Main Document, | ||
Att: 8 Main Document, | ||
Att: 9 Main Document | ||
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order appointing mediator/scheduling mediation
Thu 01/31 5:10 PM
ORDER appointing Jack L. Townsend, Sr., Esq. as mediator in this action. Mediation Conference set for 4/29/2019 at 1:00 PM. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 1/31/2019. (SMB) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of mediation conference/hearing
Thu 01/31 1:38 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 4/29/19 at 1:00 pm before Jack L. Townsend, Sr., Esquire. (Kimsey, Paul) |
|
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Case management and scheduling order
Wed 01/30 11:44 AM
E.R.I.S.A. CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Filing of Administrative Record by Defendant due by 2/19/2019; Dispositive motions due by 5/30/2019; Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2019 at 9:15 AM in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Bench Trial set on the DECEMBER 2019 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 1/30/2019. (SMB) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order
Wed 01/30 11:44 AM
ENDORSED ORDER vacating 10 Case Management and Scheduling Order. The Court will enter an E.R.I.S.A. Scheduling Order with new deadlines. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 1/30/2019. (SMB) |
|
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Case management and scheduling order
Wed 10/24 11:18 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/16/2019, Dispositive motions due by 11/15/2019, Pretrial Conference set for WEDNESDAY, FEBRUARY 5, 2020 at 9:15 AM in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr., Bench Trial set for MARCH 2020 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 10/24/2018. (AD) |
|
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Case Management Report
Tue 10/23 3:36 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Kimsey, Paul) |
|
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 10/22 11:03 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Lehner, Steven) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Mon 09/24 4:05 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Life Insurance Company of North America. Related case(s): no (Lehner, Steven) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Mon 09/24 4:04 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent CIGNA Corporation, Corporate Parent Cigna Holdings, Inc. for Life Insurance Company of North America.. (Lehner, Steven) |
|
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 09/21 8:49 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 4 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall file its response or answer on or before October 22, 2018. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 9/21/2018. (AD) |
|
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 09/20 4:10 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Lehner, Steven) |
|
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons returned executed
Thu 09/06 3:28 PM
RETURN of service executed on 8/31/18 by Michael Gershak as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (Kimsey, Paul) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons issued
Tue 08/14 2:44 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (EA) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 08/14 2:43 PM
COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA052399) filed by Michael Gershak.(EA) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |