New York Southern District Court
Judge:Edgardo Ramos
Case #: 1:18-cv-07358
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441nr Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2018
Terminated:Aug 17, 2018
Last checked: Friday Sep 28, 2018 5:13 AM EDT
Defendant
IAC/InterActiveCorp
Defendant
Match Group, Inc.
Represented By
Marc Wolinsky
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan Badeen
Plaintiff
Paul Cafardo
Plaintiff
Gareth Johnson
Plaintiff
James Kim
Plaintiff
Alexa Mateen
Plaintiff
Justin Mateen
Plaintiff
Joshua Metz
Plaintiff
Ryan Ogle
Plaintiff
Rosette Pambakian
Plaintiff
Sean Rad

Docket last updated: 62 minutes ago
Friday, August 17, 2018
8 8 3 pgs order Order Fri 12:38 PM
ORDER WITHDRAWING REMOVAL AND REMANDING TO STATE COURT: Upon receipt of additional information, Defendant Match Group, Inc. ("Match") respectfully withdraws its notice of removal, Dkt. Nos. 1 and 4, and requests that the Court order that this action be remanded to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, New York County. In support of its request, Match states as follows: 1. Prior to filing its notice of removal, Match's counsel inquired of defendant IAC/InterActiveCorp ("IAC") and of IAC's registered agent, CT Corporation, and was advised that neither had any record of service of the complaint in this action on IAC. 2. IAC was subsequently informed at 3:02 PM on August 15, 2018 by CT Corporation that service had been made on August 14, 2018, prior to the time that Match filed its petition for removal. 3. In light of these newly-learned facts, Match is therefore promptly filing this notice of withdrawal of its request for removal, and respectfully requests that the Court remand the action to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, New York County. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/17/2018) (jwh) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
Related: [-]
transfer Case Remanded Out - State Court Mon 6:50 PM
CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1Z E22 E53 22 1001 123 8 on 8/20/2018. (jwh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 16, 2018
7 7 3 pgs misc Proposed Order Thu 12:13 PM
PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Match Group, Inc.. (Wolinsky, Marc) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error Thu 9:35 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Marc Wolinsky to RE-FILE Document 6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Use the event type proposed order. Re-caption the document to order and notice withdrawing removal. (km)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Thu 3:51 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. 7 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 15, 2018
6 6 3 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 6:10 PM
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Jonathan Badeen, Paul Cafardo, IAC/InterActiveCorp, Gareth Johnson, James Kim, Alexa Mateen, Justin Mateen, Joshua Metz, Ryan Ogle, Rosette Pambakian, Sean Rad. Document filed by Match Group, Inc.. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . (Wolinsky, Marc) Modified on 8/16/2018 (km).
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 1:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wolinsky, Marc)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Removal Wed 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 654038/2018..Document filed by Match Group, Inc..(Wolinsky, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - NYS Supreme Docket,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - NYS Supreme Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - NYS Supreme Complaint
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Wed 11:48 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Marc Wolinsky to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Notice of Removal exhibits must be labeled pursuant to ECF Filing Rule 13.3. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Wed 11:49 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Marc Wolinsky to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated June 2017. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Wed 11:50 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marc Wolinsky. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $2,000,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000. (pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 11:54 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 11:54 AM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 11:54 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 14, 2018
3 3 1 pgs misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 8:47 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent IAC/InterActiveCorp for Match Group, Inc.. Document filed by Match Group, Inc..(Wolinsky, Marc)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 8:27 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wolinsky, Marc) Modified on 8/15/2018 (pc).
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs notice Notice of Removal Tue 8:25 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 654038/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15451214).Document filed by Match Group, Inc..(Wolinsky, Marc) Modified on 8/15/2018 (pc).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 55 pgs Exhibit C