VALANCOURT BOOKS, LLC v. TEMPLE et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Amy Berman Jackson |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-01922 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Aug 16, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 23, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 12, 2019 3:48 AM EST |
Defendant
KARYN A. TEMPLE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MATTHEW G. WHITAKER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
VALANCOURT BOOKS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
KARYN TEMPLE CLAGGETT
Terminated: 11/21/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III
Terminated: 11/21/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, January 12, 2024 | ||
order
.Order
Fri 01/12 2:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of34 the parties' joint notice, it is ORDERED that proceedings before this Court are STAYED and that defendants must file a status report within two business days of when they seek Supreme Court review or when the time for seeking such review has expired, whichever occurs first. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/12/24. (DMK) |
||
Wednesday, January 10, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 01/10 5:26 PM
NOTICE to the Court (Jointly Filed) by MERRICK B. GARLAND, SHIRA PERLMUTTER (Riess, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2023 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 12/28 10:09 AM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of33 the mandate and [33-1] judgment of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit and its August 29, 2023 ruling, summary judgment is hereby GRANTED in favor of plaintiff Valancourt Books, LLC. At this point, it is necessary to determine what relief would be appropriate. Therefore, it is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must file a joint notice by January 11, 2024 informing the Court whether they are interested in engaging in mediation, and if so, whether they are requesting a referral to a magistrate judge or to the Court's mediation program for that purpose. If not, the parties must propose a schedule for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/28/23. (DMK) |
||
Friday, December 22, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 12/27 11:51 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to31 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by VALANCOURT BOOKS, LLC ; USCA Case Number 21-5203 (Attachment: #1 USCA Judgment August 29, 2023)(zjm) |
|
Thursday, September 23, 2021 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Sun 09/26 5:20 PM
USCA Case Number 21-5203 for31 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by VALANCOURT BOOKS, LLC. (zjf) |
||
Friday, September 17, 2021 | ||
32 | 32
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Fri 09/17 3:31 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid re31 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (zjf) |
|
31 | 31
appeal
Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
Fri 09/17 2:26 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to30 Memorandum & Opinion,29 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, by VALANCOURT BOOKS, LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ADCDC-8740266. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (McNamara, Robert) |
|
Friday, July 23, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
26
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Fri 07/23 8:56 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/23/21. (lcabj2) |
|
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Fri 07/23 8:55 AM
ORDER. It is ORDERED that defendants'17 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED, and plaintiff's18 cross motion for summary judgment is DENIED. See order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/23/21. (lcabj2) |
|
Friday, July 02, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Response to (non-motion) Document
Fri 07/02 11:18 AM
RESPONSE re27 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by WILLIAM P. BARR, SHIRA PERLMUTTER. (Riess, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, June 29, 2021 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 06/29 9:18 AM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of plaintiff's27 notice of supplemental authority, it is ORDERED that any submission by defendants as to why this opinion is not controlling must be filed by July 6, 2021. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/29/21. (lcabj2) |
||
Wednesday, June 23, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Supplemental Authority
Wed 06/23 4:10 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by VALANCOURT BOOKS, LLC(McNamara, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Cedar Point Nursery v. Hassid | ||
Tuesday, December 22, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
9
pgs
misc
Memorandum
Tue 12/22 11:36 PM
MEMORANDUM re24 Order,, Set Deadlines, by WILLIAM P. BARR, KARYN A. TEMPLE. (Riess, Daniel) |
|
25 | 25
9
pgs
misc
Memorandum
Tue 12/22 11:08 PM
MEMORANDUM re24 Order,, Set Deadlines, by VALANCOURT BOOKS, LLC.(McNamara, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Supplemental Declaration of James Jenkins | ||
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 12/11 4:49 PM
ORDER. The Court ORDERS that the parties must each supplement their submissions by December 22, 2020, addressing whether defendants' offer to accept electronic copies in lieu of physical copies of the requested works renders the dispute moot. The defendants must also clarify the scope of their stated willingness to accept electronic copies of plaintiff's works. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/11/20. (lcabj2) |
|
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Fri 09/13 10:05 AM
REPLY to opposition to motion re18 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by VALANCOURT BOOKS, LLC. (McNamara, Robert) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
11
pgs
misc
Memorandum
Thu 09/12 5:02 PM
ERRATA re21 Reply to opposition to Motion, filed by WILLIAM P. BARR, KARYN A. TEMPLE,20 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by WILLIAM P. BARR, KARYN A. TEMPLE by WILLIAM P. BARR, KARYN A. TEMPLE. (Riess, Daniel) Modified event title on 9/16/2019 (znmw). |
|
Friday, August 23, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Fri 08/23 4:32 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by WILLIAM P. BARR, KARYN A. TEMPLE.(Riess, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Facts Response to Supplemental Statement of Facts, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
20 | 20
29
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Fri 08/23 4:30 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re18 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by WILLIAM P. BARR, KARYN A. TEMPLE.(Riess, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Facts Response to Supplemental Statement of Facts, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Fri 08/02 1:06 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by VALANCOURT BOOKS, LLC.(McNamara, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Facts Supplemental Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of James Jenkins, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 08/02 1:02 PM
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by VALANCOURT BOOKS, LLC(McNamara, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Facts Supplemental Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of James Jenkins, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 03, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 07/03 2:46 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by WILLIAM P. BARR, KARYN A. TEMPLE(Riess, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Joint Stipulations of Fact, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 07, 2019 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 05/07 9:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court hereby adopts the parties' proposed briefing schedule: defendants will file their motion for summary judgment and opening brief on or before July 3, 2019. Plaintiff will file its opposition to defendants' motion and its cross-motion for summary judgment in a combined brief on or before August 2, 2019. Defendants will file their reply brief in support of their motion and opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion in a combined brief on or before August 23, 2019. Plaintiff will file its reply brief in support of its cross-motion on or before September 13, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 05/07/2019. (lcabj3) |
||
Tuesday, April 30, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Status Report
Tue 04/30 5:46 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by KARYN A. TEMPLE, MATTHEW G. WHITAKER.(Riess, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 04/18 10:30 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by KARYN A. TEMPLE, MATTHEW G. WHITAKER(Riess, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 04/18 4:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time. On or before April 30, 2019, the parties shall complete their factual stipulations or request this Court to set a deadline for the close of discovery on issues related to any material facts not stipulated. It is further ORDERED that on or before April 30, 2019, the parties shall file a second joint status report, with a proposed schedule for summary judgment briefing and for any necessary discovery period. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 04/18/2019. (lcabj3) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/05 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey H Redfern on behalf of All Plaintiffs |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2019 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 04/02 12:02 PM
MINUTE ORDER. On or before April 24, 2019, the parties shall complete their factual stipulations or request this Court to set a deadline for the close of discovery on issues related to any material facts not stipulated. It is further ORDERED that on or before April 24, 2019, the parties shall file a second joint status report, together with a proposed scheduling order setting forth a schedule for summary judgment briefing and for any necessary discovery period. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 04/02/2019. (lcabj3) |
||
Monday, April 01, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Status Report
Mon 04/01 1:23 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by VALANCOURT BOOKS, LLC.(McNamara, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 15, 2019 | ||
minutes
Meet and Confer Hearing ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 02/15 1:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Meet and Confer Hearing held on 2/15/2019. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by 4/1/2019. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (jth) |
||
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Meet and Confer Statement
Fri 02/08 9:59 AM
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT.(McNamara, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling Order | ||
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/29 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Restoration of Appropriations by KARYN A. TEMPLE, MATTHEW G. WHITAKER(Riess, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 01/29 5:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the government's notice11 , the stay in this case is lifted and the parties must file a joint report pursuant to Local Rule 16.3 by February 8, 2019. The Initial Scheduling Conference will be held on February 15, 2019 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 3. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 01/29/2019. (lcabj3) |
||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
order
.Order
Wed 01/16 11:01 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The Initial Scheduling Conference presently set for 1/17/2019 at 9:30 AM is vacated. Defendants must notify the Court within two business days of the resumption of government operations and, at that time propose both a revised schedule for filing the joint report pursuant to Local Rule 16.3 and a date for the resetting the Initial Scheduling Conference. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/16/2019. (jth) |
||
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 01/07 12:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting10 Motion to Stay. Defendants must notify the Court within two business days of the resumption of government operations and at that time propose a revised schedule for filing the joint report due on January 10, 2019. The Court will not vacate the January 17, 2018 9:30 AM Initial Scheduling Conference yet. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/7/19. (DMK) |
||
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Stay
Fri 01/04 7:48 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by KARYN A. TEMPLE, MATTHEW G. WHITAKER(Riess, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 12/13 2:51 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: At the request of Counsel for the Defendants who indicates the consent of Counsel for the Plaintiff, the Initial Scheduling Conference presently set for 12/21/2018 at 9:30 AM is reset for 1/17/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. The Joint Report pursuant to Local Rule 16.3 is now due by 1/10/2019. (jth) |
||
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 11/30 3:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Meet and Confer Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. The parties shall meet, confer, and file a Joint Report pursuant to Local Rule 16.3 by 12/14/2018. Any dates contained in the Report should be expressed as specific dates (month/day/year) rather than as time frames (e.g., "60 days after the entry of the scheduling order"). Counsel are directed to contact the Court's Deputy Clerk in the first instance to request the rescheduling of court appearances. The party seeking the change in schedule must first confer with counsel for all other parties and be prepared to provide the Deputy Clerk with proposed mutually agreeable dates. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/30/2018. (jth) |
||
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 11/21 2:00 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by KARYN TEMPLE CLAGGETT, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III.(Riess, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 10/11 4:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting8 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that defendants' response to the complaint is due by November 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/11/18. (DMK) |
||
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 10/10 5:26 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by KARYN TEMPLE CLAGGETT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III(Riess, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 10/10 5:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Riess on behalf of All Defendants (Riess, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Tue 08/21 2:02 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/17/18. (McNamara, Robert) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Tue 08/21 1:58 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KARYN TEMPLE CLAGGETT served on 8/17/2018 (McNamara, Robert) |
|
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/20 3:12 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave of Robert J. McNamara to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/20/18. (DMK) |
||
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 08/17 3:12 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by VALANCOURT BOOKS, LLC. (Flaherty, Renee) |
|
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 08/16 11:59 AM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to KARYN TEMPLE CLAGGETT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III.(zsth) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
2 | 2
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/16 9:31 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert J. McNamara, :Firm- Institute for Justice, :Address- 901 N. Glebe Road, Suite 900, Arlington, VA 22203. Phone No. - (703) 682-9320. Fax No. - (703) 682-9321 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5642459. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Valancourt Books, LLC(Flaherty, Renee) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Robert J. McNamara in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 08/16 9:19 AM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5642377) filed by Valancourt Books, LLC.(Flaherty, Renee) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons to Copyright Office, | ||
Att: 3 Summons to US Attorney General, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit E | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 08/16 10:51 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsth) |