In re: Google Location History Litigation
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward J Davila |
Case #: | 5:18-cv-05062 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 17, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 13, 2019 12:43 AM PST |
Defendant
XXVI Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alphabet Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Google, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Dixon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stacy Smedley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Najat Oshana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mahon Nurudaaym
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leslie Lee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronnie Kaufman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Jack
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fredrick Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Carson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aichi Ali
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Domenic Lombardo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Napoleon Patacsil
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
365 | 365
misc
Proposed Order
Tue 04/23 10:03 AM
Revised Proposed Judgment re356 Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Revised by Michael Childs, Noe Gamboa, Napoleon Patacsil. (Wolfson, Tina) Modified on 4/23/2024 (kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
|
364 | 364
misc
Proposed Order
Tue 04/23 10:01 AM
Revised Proposed Final Approval Order (with Exhibits A and B) re356 Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion f-r Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Revised by Michael Childs, Noe Gamboa, Napoleon Patacsil. (Wolfson, Tina) Modified on 4/23/2024 (kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
363 | 363
misc
Transcript Order
Mon 04/22 12:48 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/18/2024 before Judge Edward J. Davila by John Andren, Matthew Lilley, Joseph S. St. John, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Frank, Theodore) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
362 | 362
misc
Transcript Order
Fri 04/19 12:33 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 18, 2024 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Michael Childs, Noe Gamboa, Napoleon Patacsil, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Wolfson, Tina) |
|
361 | 361
misc
Transcript Order
Fri 04/19 11:36 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/18/2024 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Google, LLC, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Gorman, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
360 | 360
minutes
Motion Hearing 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 04/18 3:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Motion Hearing held on 4/18/2024 re 356 Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, and 351 Motion for Attorney Fees and Expenses, and for Class Representative Service Awards. The Court finds that all of the Rule 23(a) and (b) factors have been met, and notes that this settlement is for an all-cy pres award. The Court finds cy pres is an appropriate resolution in this case and will grant approval of the resolution. The Court makes modifications to the proposed cy pres allocations represented in Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval. Counsel shall memorialize and complete the math accordingly and provide a revised proposed Order. Any deficits shall be drawn from the allocations proposed for Electronic Frontier Foundation. Total Time in Court: 1 hr, 35 min (9:08-10:43 AM). Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. The Court will grant Plaintiffs motion for costs and expenses in the amount of $151,756.23 and for service awards of $5,000 to each of the named plaintiffs. The Court will grant attorneys fees as requested. Plaintiff Attorney: Tina Wolfson, Michael Sobol, Theodore Maya, Melissa Gardner, Michael Levin Gesundheit, Michael Sheen. Defendant Attorney: Thomas Gorman, Benjamin Berkowitz. Objectors Attorney: Theodore Frank Also Present: Jessica Gonzlez (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (crr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/18/2024) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
359 | 359
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Tue 04/16 4:44 PM
REPLY filed byMichael Childs, Noe Gamboa, Napoleon Patacsil. (Wolfson, Tina) |