Smiley v. Kana Hotels Inc et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kristine G Baker |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00624 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation |
Case Filed: | Aug 30, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 22, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 26, 2019 2:52 AM CST |
Defendant
Helm HR LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kana Hotels Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lyons Human Resources Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James T Smiley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 10/22 4:36 PM
ORDER granting17 the joint motion for approval of settlement agreement; approving the Settlement Agreement; dismissing this action with prejudice and without costs to any party, except to the extent otherwise expressly provided by agreement of the parties. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/22/2019. (jbh) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Dismiss
Thu 09/05 4:02 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice and for Approval of Settlement Agreement by Helm HR LLC, Kana Hotels Inc, Lyons Human Resources Inc (Cross, J.) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 03/18 4:42 PM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 12/2/2019 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Discovery due by 8/30/2019; Motions due by 10/3/2019; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 11/12/2019; Status Report due by 10/3/2019. Signed at the direction of the Court on 03/18/2019. (tmw) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
5
pgs
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Tue 03/05 4:35 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by James T Smiley. (Sanford, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Tue 12/18 2:42 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 2/19/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/5/2019; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 12/2/2019 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/18/2018. (tmw) |
|
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 11/16 3:16 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Helm HR LLC, Kana Hotels Inc, Lyons Human Resources Inc.(Cross, J.) |
|
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 10/26 2:04 PM
ORDER granting11 defendants' unopposed motion for extension to file their responsive pleading to Plaintiff James T. Smiley's complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including 11/16/2018, to file an answer or otherwise respond to Mr. Smiley's complaint. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/26/2018. (kdr) |
|
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 10/25 10:59 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by Helm HR LLC, Kana Hotels Inc, Lyons Human Resources Inc (Cross, J.) |
|
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 10/24 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by J. Bruce Cross on behalf of Helm HR LLC, Lyons Human Resources Inc (Cross, J.) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 10/24 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by J. Bruce Cross on behalf of Kana Hotels Inc (Cross, J.) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 10/12 3:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by James T Smiley. Kana Hotels Inc served on 10/5/2018. (Sanford, Joshua) |
|
Monday, October 08, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 10/08 6:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by James T Smiley. Helm HR LLC served on 9/13/2018. (Sanford, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 09/18 5:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by James T Smiley. Lyons Human Resources Inc served on 9/10/2018. (Sanford, Joshua) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/18 9:32 AM
ORDER granting3 ,4 motions to admit Mr. Head and Ms. Hilbert pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/18/2018. (cmn) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/11 4:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Bethany A. Hilbert. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3314892. Filed by James T Smiley (Sanford, Joshua) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/11 4:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by C. Andrew Head. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3314885. Filed by James T Smiley (Sanford, Joshua) |
|
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Fri 08/31 8:04 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original exhibits were not submitted with the Complaint. The exhibits were added to docket entry1 based on the attached correspondence. (jak) |
|
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 08/30 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT filed by James T Smiley against All Defendants. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT068579. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service.(cmn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |