Sprout v. Village of Hudson, et al
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | James E Shadid |
Referred: | Jonathan E Hawley |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-01322 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination) |
Case Filed: | Sep 04, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 24, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 03, 2019 3:19 AM CST |
Defendant
Allison Brutlag
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dave Brutlag
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sara Hill
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alan Meissner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Phil Morris
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pat O'Grady
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Caleb Post
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Betty Scanlon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dale Sparks
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kerry Tudor
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Village of Hudson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kayley Sprout
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
order
Order
Mon 06/24 3:15 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER directing the Clerk to close the case pursuant to the stipulations27 ,28 by the parties. This matter is now terminated. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 06/24/2019. (EP, ilcd) |
||
misc
Remark
Mon 06/24 3:25 PM
Remark: This case is closed pursuant to Stipulations of Dismissal filed on 6/11/2019. (VH, ilcd) |
||
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 06/11 9:58 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Individual Defendants) by Kayley Sprout. (Miller, Stephen) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 06/11 9:55 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Village of Hudson) by Kayley Sprout. (Miller, Stephen) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation
Mon 06/10 11:07 AM
STIPULATION by Kayley Sprout.. (Miller, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 04/03 10:12 AM
TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: The Court adopts the Discovery Plan24 . Discovery due by 2/14/20. Dispositive Motions due by 4/3/20. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/13/20 at 3:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 9/14/2020 at 9:00 AM, BOTH in Courtroom A before District Judge Shadid. Rule 16 conference set 4/5/19 at 11:00 AM is VACATED. Court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are expected to review Judge Hawleys Standing Order that was revised on 12/6/2018. Parties are reminded of their option to consent to proceed before US Magistrate Judge. See attached form. Parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. Counsel/Parties are reminded of the importance of appearing for hearings scheduled via telephone. Failure to appear will result in in-person appearances for all further proceedings. Entered: 4/3/2019. (WG, ilcd)) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Discovery Plan - Proposed/Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Tue 04/02 4:05 PM
DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Allison Brutlag, Dave Brutlag, Sara Hill, Alan Meissner, Phil Morris, Pat O'Grady, Caleb Post, Betty Scanlon, Dale Sparks, Kerry Tudor, Village of Hudson. (Bruch, Julie) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 03/15 9:17 AM
ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Allison Brutlag, Dave Brutlag, Sara Hill, Alan Meissner, Phil Morris, Pat O'Grady, Caleb Post, Betty Scanlon, Dale Sparks, Kerry Tudor, Village of Hudson.(Bruch, Julie) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 03/05 8:26 AM
Set Hearings: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/5/2019 at 11:00 AM by telephone from Peoria (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. (WG, ilcd) |
||
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
14
pgs
order
Order Setting Scheduling Conference (Rule 16)
Mon 03/04 12:51 PM
TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 4/5/19 at 11:00 AM via telephone (Court to set up the call). If Counsel are to be reached at a number different than what is listed on the docket sheet, they are directed to phone Judge Hawley's courtroom deputy at 309-671-7117 and confirm the phone number where they may be reached for the call. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 4/2/19. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 3/4/2019. (WG, ilcd) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
12
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 03/01 3:18 PM
ORDER AND OPINION entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 3/1/2019. For the reasons stated herein, Defendants' Motion17 to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint is DENIED. See full written Order. (VH, ilcd) |
|
Wednesday, February 20, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response to Motion/Petition
Wed 02/20 1:47 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re16 Amended Complaint, to Counts VIII-XII filed by Plaintiff Kayley Sprout. (Feczko, Kerri) |
|
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance of Attorney
Thu 02/14 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kerri Lynn Feczko on behalf of Kayley Sprout (Feczko, Kerri) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 02/08 8:51 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re16 Amended Complaint, to Counts VIII-XII by Plaintiff Kayley Sprout. Responses due by 2/22/2019 (Miller, Stephen) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 02/08 3:18 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Plaintiff's unopposed18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Defendant's17 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's response is due by 2/20/2019. Entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 02/08/2019. (EP, ilcd) |
||
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 01/29 12:12 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re16 Amended Complaint, to Counts VIII-XII by Defendants Allison Brutlag, Dave Brutlag, Sara Hill, Alan Meissner, Phil Morris, Pat O'Grady, Caleb Post, Betty Scanlon, Dale Sparks, Kerry Tudor, Village of Hudson. Responses due by 2/12/2019 (Bruch, Julie) |
|
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 01/22 10:40 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot Defendant's13 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff has now filed a Third Amended Complaint16 . Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(E), Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is rendered MOOT. Entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 1/22/2019. (EP, ilcd) |
||
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 01/17 3:16 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Third) against Allison Brutlag, Dave Brutlag, Sara Hill, Alan Meissner, Phil Morris, Pat O'Grady, Caleb Post, Betty Scanlon, Dale Sparks, Kerry Tudor, Village of Hudson, filed by Kayley Sprout.(Miller, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 01/17 3:05 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Plaintiff's second unopposed15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Defendants'13 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Response or Amended Complaint is due by 1/25/2019. Entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 1/17/2019. (EP, ilcd) |
||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 01/16 2:22 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re12 Amended Complaint to Counts IX and X by Plaintiff Kayley Sprout. Responses due by 1/30/2019 (Miller, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, December 27, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 12/27 8:47 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Plaintiff's second unopposed14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Defendant's13 Motion to Dismiss. The response deadline is extended to 1/16/2019. Entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 12/27/2018. (EP, ilcd) |
||
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 12/20 9:33 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re12 Amended Complaint to Counts IX and X by Plaintiff Kayley Sprout. Responses due by 1/3/2019 (Miller, Stephen) |
|
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 12/17 2:33 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re12 Amended Complaint to Counts IX and X by Defendants Sara Hill, Alan Meissner, Phil Morris, Pat O'Grady, Caleb Post, Dale Sparks, Village of Hudson. Responses due by 12/31/2018(Bruch, Julie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Martorana v Village of Elmwood Park, 2013 WL 1686869, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Robinson v Morgan Stanley, 2007 WL 2815839, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Banks v Chicago Bd of Educ, 2013 WL 951111 | ||
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 12/04 2:32 PM
TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley finding as moot9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer pursuant to the Text Order entered on 12/3/18 which found the motion rendered MOOT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(E). Entered on 12/3/18. (WG, ilcd) |
||
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 12/03 12:02 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Village of Hudson, Dale Sparks, Alan Meissner, Sara Hill, Phil Morris, Caleb Post, Pat O'Grady, filed by Kayley Sprout.(Miller, Stephen) Modified on 12/3/2018 to correct dfts (JRK, ilcd). |
|
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 12/03 9:18 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint11 is GRANTED. Clerk is directed to file the Second Amended Complaint attached to motion11 . Accordingly, the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support and Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Two Claims for Village9 is rendered MOOT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(E). Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 12/3/2018. (KZ, ilcd) Modified on 12/3/2018 to add direction to the clerk. (WG, ilcd) |
||
TEXT ORDER: The Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint11 is GRANTED. Clerk is directed to file the Second Amended Complaint attached to motion11 . Accordingly, the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support and Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Two Claims for Village9 is rendered MOOT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(E). Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 12/3/2018. (KZ, ilcd) Modified on 12/3/2018 to add direction to the clerk. (WG, ilcd). | ||
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 11/30 2:16 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Kayley Sprout. Responses due by 12/14/2018(Miller, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 11/19 10:33 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Plaintiff's unopposed10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Defendant's9 Motion to Dismiss. The response deadline is extended to 11/30/2018. Entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 11/19/2018. (EP, ilcd) |
||
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 11/16 12:55 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re3 Amended Complaint to Counts IX and X by Plaintiff Kayley Sprout. Responses due by 11/30/2018 (Miller, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 11/06 4:21 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re3 Amended Complaint to Counts IX and X by Defendants Allison Brutlag, Dave Brutlag, Sara Hill, Alan Meissner, Phil Morris, Pat O'Grady, Caleb Post, Betty Scanlon, Dale Sparks, Kerry Tudor, Village of Hudson. Responses due by 11/20/2018(Bruch, Julie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Mantorano v. Village of Elmwood Park, 2013 WL 1686869, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Robinson v. Morgan Stanley, 2007 WL 2815839, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Banks v. Chicago Bd. Of Educ., 2013 WL 951111 | ||
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
14
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 11/05 3:54 PM
TEXT ORDER granting unopposed7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants have until 11/6/2018 to file their responsive pleading to the Amended Complaint. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 11/5/18. (WG, ilcd) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 11/05 11:47 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Their Responsive Pleading to the First Amended Complaint by Defendants Allison Brutlag, Dave Brutlag, Sara Hill, Alan Meissner, Phil Morris, Caleb Post, Betty Scanlon, Dale Sparks, Kerry Tudor, Village of Hudson. Responses due by 11/19/2018 (Bruch, Julie) |
|
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Tue 10/16 10:40 AM
TEXT ORDER denying5 the Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending the Outcome of Administrative Investigation. The Court notes that the Plaintiff will have an opportunity to amend her Complaint once the administrative proceedings have concluded on the claims not included in her original Complaint. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/16/2018. (KZ, ilcd) |
||
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Response to Motion/Petition
Mon 10/15 2:50 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re5 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending the Outcome of Administrative Investigation filed by Defendants Allison Brutlag, Dave Brutlag, Sara Hill, Alan Meissner, Phil Morris, Pat O'Grady, Caleb Post, Betty Scanlon, Dale Sparks, Kerry Tudor, Village of Hudson. (Bruch, Julie) |
|
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Stay
Tue 10/02 12:07 PM
MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending the Outcome of Administrative Investigation by Plaintiff Kayley Sprout. Responses due by 10/16/2018(Miller, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance of Attorney
Fri 09/14 9:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Julie A Bruch on behalf of Allison Brutlag, Dave Brutlag, Sara Hill, Alan Meissner, Phil Morris, Pat O'Grady, Caleb Post, Betty Scanlon, Dale Sparks, Kerry Tudor, Village of Hudson (Bruch, Julie) |
|
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 09/05 4:01 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kayley Sprout.(Miller, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance of Attorney
Tue 09/04 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Stephen R Miller on behalf of Kayley Sprout (Miller, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Attorney Complaint
Tue 09/04 4:49 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-2919333.), filed by Kayley Sprout.(Miller, Stephen) |