State Of New York et al v. U.S. Department of the Interior et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Valerie E Caproni |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-08084 |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Cause | 16:703 Migratory Bird Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 05, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 31, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 04, 2019 4:52 AM EST |
Amicus
Rollin Sparrowe
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Paul Schmidt
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Lynn Scarlett
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
John Rogers
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Lyle Laverty
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Lynn Greenwalt
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Tom Dwyer
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Brad Bortner
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Robert Blohm
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Donald Barry
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Jonathan Andrew
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Principal Deputy Sol Daniel Jorjani
Washington, DC 20240
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
1849 C Street NW
Washington, DC 20240 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Department of the Interior
1849 C Street NW
Washngton, DC 20240 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Oregon
Oregon Department of Justice, Natural Resources Section 1162 Court Street NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of New Mexico
Office of New Mexico Attorney General, Consumer & Environmen 201 Third St NW, Suite 300
Albuquerque, NM 87102 |
|
Plaintiff
State of New Jersey
New Jersey Division of Law, Attorney General Gurbir S. Grewa R.J. Hughes Justice Complex 25 Market Street
Trenton, NJ 08625 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Maryland
Office of Maryland Attorney General Brian Frosh 200 Saint Paul Place
Baltimore, MD 21202 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Illinois
Office of Illinois Attorney General Lisa Madigan 69 West Washington, 18th Floor
Chicago, IL 60602 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of California
Office of Xavier Becerra, California Attorney General 1515 Clay Street
Oakland, CA 94612 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State Of New York
New York Attorney General Environmental Protection Bureau 28 Liberty, 19th Flr.
New York, NY 10005 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Office of Massachusetts Attorney General Maura Healey One Ashburton Place, 18th Floor
Boston, MA 02108 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 02, 2021 | ||
84 | 84
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 03/02 3:43 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to (64 in 1:18-cv-04601-VEC, 94 in 1:18-cv-04596-VEC, 81 in 1:18-cv-08084-VEC) Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of the Interior, Daniel Jorjani, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. USCA Case Number 20-3491 The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered"... Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 03/02/2021. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-04596-VEC, 1:18-cv-04601-VEC, 1:18-cv-08084-VEC.(nd) |