MOORE et al v. COHEN et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas F Hogan |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-02082 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander |
Case Filed: | Sep 05, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 29, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 04, 2019 3:29 AM EST |
Defendant
CBS CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SHOWTIME, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KAYLA MOORE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROY STEWART MOORE
|
Represented By
|
1. | Roy Moore Claims Sacha Baron Cohen's 'Yerushalayim TV' Fraud Voids Deal (hollywoodreporter.com) |
Submitted Thu 12/13/2018 | |
2. | Roy Moore Sues Sacha Baron Cohen for $95M Over 'Who Is America?' Appearance (hollywoodreporter.com) |
Submitted Thu 09/06/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 05, 2020 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Transcript
Fri 06/05 5:04 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 04/29/2019; Page Numbers: 1-40. Date of Issuance:06/05/2020. Court Reporter/Transcriber Crystal M. Pilgrim, Telephone number 202.354.3127, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/26/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2020.(Pilgrim, Crystal) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
order
.Order
Wed 06/05 9:39 PM
ORDER attached denying36 Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration of Courts Order of April 29, 2019 and Motion to Recuse or Disqualify and Random Reassignment to Another Jurist of This Court. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on June 5, 2019. (JK) |
|
39 | 39
4
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Wed 06/05 9:36 PM
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on June 5, 2019. (JK) |
|
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Mon 06/03 9:24 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re36 MOTION for Reconsideration re34 Order on Motion to Transfer Case MOTION for RecusalMOTION to Reassign Case filed by KAYLA MOORE, ROY STEWART MOORE.(Klayman, Larry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
misc
Receipt and Acknowledgment of Transfer Papers
Wed 05/29 3:05 PM
Receipt on 05/29/2019 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 1:19-cv-04977 sent by Southern District of New York. (zrdj) |
||
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
5
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Tue 05/28 8:41 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re36 MOTION for Reconsideration re34 Order on Motion to Transfer Case MOTION for RecusalMOTION to Reassign Case filed by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC.. (Zycherman, Lisa) |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Reconsideration
Tue 05/14 8:40 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re34 Order on Motion to Transfer Case by KAYLA MOORE, ROY STEWART MOORE (Klayman, Larry) |
|
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Case Transferred Out
Mon 05/13 4:32 PM
Case transferred to the USDC for the SD of NY, pursuant to the Court Order entered 04/29/2019. Sent to Court via by extraction. (jf) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Transfer Case
Mon 04/29 2:40 PM
ORDER; granting Motion to Transfer Case6 , Transfer due by 5/9/2019,Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/29/2019. (hs) |
|
minutes
Motion Hearing
Mon 04/29 11:28 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas F. Hogan: Motion Hearing held on 4/29/2019. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendants'6 Motion to Transfer Case has been GRANTED. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (zjd) |
||
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 03/18 2:21 PM
ORDER granting32 Motion to Correct Prior Filings. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on March 18, 2019. (lctfh3) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/18 12:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting22 Motion to Admit Eric J. Feder Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on March 18, 2019. (lctfh3) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/18 12:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting23 Renewed Motion to Admit Elizabeth A. McNamara Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on March 18, 2019. (lctfh3) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/18 12:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting24 Renewed Motion to Admit Rachel F. Strom Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on March 18, 2019. (lctfh3) |
||
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 03/15 10:00 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct18 Reply to opposition to Motion,4 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests,6 MOTION to Transfer Case ,11 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion , 5 Consent Motion, 9 Motion to Extend Time, 12 Consent Motion, Consistent With Corrected Versions of Filings Accompanying Notices of Errata, ECF Nos. 25-31 by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC.(Zycherman, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
31 | 31
misc
Errata
Fri 03/15 9:52 PM
ERRATA Notice by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC.18 Reply to opposition to Motion filed by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC..(Zycherman, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Corrected Version of ECF No. 18 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Errata
Fri 03/15 9:50 PM
ERRATA Notice by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC.12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC..(Zycherman, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Corrected Version of ECF No. 12, | ||
Att: 2 Corrected Version of ECF No. 12-1, | ||
Att: 3 ECF No. 12-2 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Errata
Fri 03/15 9:48 PM
ERRATA Notice by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC.11 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion filed by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC..(Zycherman, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Corrected Version of ECF No. 11 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Errata
Fri 03/15 9:47 PM
ERRATA Notice by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC.9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Pending Resolution of Transfer Motion (ECF No. 6) filed by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC..(Zycherman, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Corrected Version of ECF No. 9, | ||
Att: 2 Corrected Version of ECF No. 9-1, | ||
Att: 3 ECF No. 9-2 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Errata
Fri 03/15 9:43 PM
ERRATA Notice by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC.6 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC..(Zycherman, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Corrected version of ECF No. 6, | ||
Att: 2 Corrected Version of ECF No. 6-1, | ||
Att: 3 ECF No. 6-2, | ||
Att: 4 ECF No. 6-3, | ||
Att: 5 ECF No. 6-4 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Errata
Fri 03/15 9:40 PM
ERRATA Notice by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC.5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, filed by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC..(Zycherman, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Corrected Version of ECF No. 5 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Errata
Fri 03/15 9:37 PM
ERRATA Notice by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC.4 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests filed by CBS CORPORATION, SHOWTIME, INC..(Zycherman, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Corrected Version of ECF No. 4 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/15 9:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rachel F. Strom, :Firm- Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, :Address- 1251 Avenue of the Americas, 21st fl., New York, NY 10020. Phone No. - 212-489-8230. Fax No. - 212-489-8340 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6004794. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC.(Zycherman, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Rachel F. Strom, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
23 | 23
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/15 9:33 PM
Endorsed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Elizabeth A. McNamara, :Firm- Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, :Address- 1251 Avenue of the Americas, 21st fl., New York, NY 10020. Phone No. - 212-489-8230. Fax No. - 212-489-8340 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6004793. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC.(Zycherman, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Elizabeth A. McNamara, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
22 | 22
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/15 9:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eric J. Feder, :Firm- Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, :Address- 1919 Pennsylvania Ave, NW, Ste 800, Washington, DC 20006. Phone No. - 202-973-4200. Fax No. - 202-973-4499 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6004787. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC.(Zycherman, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Eric J. Feder, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/15 9:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Beth Zycherman on behalf of All Defendants (Zycherman, Lisa) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 03/06 1:05 PM
MOTION Request for In Person Status Conference by KAYLA MOORE, ROY STEWART MOORE(Klayman, Larry) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 03/06 2:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER denying20 Plaintiff's Request for In Person Status Conference. A hearing on6 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) is hereby scheduled for April 29, 2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on March 6, 2019. (lctfh3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 03/06 4:28 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (hs) |
||
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 01/10 4:37 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply and Proposed Surreply by KAYLA MOORE, ROY STEWART MOORE(Klayman, Larry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Fri 01/04 7:14 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re6 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC.. (Feder, Eric) |
|
Thursday, December 27, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
3
pgs
respm
Response to motion
Thu 12/27 12:36 PM
RESPONSE re6 MOTION to Transfer Case Supplement filed by KAYLA MOORE, ROY STEWART MOORE.(Klayman, Larry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 | ||
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 12/12 9:41 PM
NOTICE of Errata by KAYLA MOORE, ROY STEWART MOORE re15 Response to motion (Klayman, Larry) |
|
15 | 15
respm
Response to motion
Wed 12/12 4:53 PM
RESPONSE re6 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by KAYLA MOORE, ROY STEWART MOORE.(Klayman, Larry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 | ||
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 11/28 11:19 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to6 MOTION to Transfer Case by KAYLA MOORE, ROY STEWART MOORE (Klayman, Larry) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 11/28 3:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting14 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Oppose Defendants' Motion to Transfer. Plaintiffs' Opposition is due by December 12, 2018, and Defendants' Reply is due by January 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on November 28, 2018. (lctfh3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 11/28 3:30 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Opposition is due by December 12, 2018, and Defendants' Reply is due by January 4(hs) |
||
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 11/21 8:36 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion to Transfer due by 11/28/2018 Reply due by 12/14/2018. (hs) |
||
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 11/20 6:23 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to6 MOTION to Transfer Case and Proposed Order by KAYLA MOORE, ROY STEWART MOORE (Klayman, Larry) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 11/20 8:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting13 Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Oppose Defendants' Motion to Transfer. Plaintiffs' Opposition is due by November 28, 2018, and Defendants' Reply is due by December 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on November 20, 2018. (lctfh3) |
||
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 11/14 3:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting7 Motion to Admit Elizabeth A. McNamara Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on November 14, 2018. (lctfh3) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 11/14 3:56 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting8 Motion to Admit Rachel F. Strom Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on November 14, 2018. (lctfh3) |
||
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 11/06 6:56 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Accordingly, the deadline for all Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to fourteen (14) days after this Court resolves Defendants' pending Motion to Transfer Case6 . Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on November 6, 2018. (lctfh3) |
||
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 11/05 4:24 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC.(Feder, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
Mon 11/05 4:20 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC. re9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Pending Resolution of Transfer Motion (ECF No. 6) (Feder, Eric) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 11/05 11:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting10 Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Oppose Defendants' Motion to Transfer. Plaintiffs' Opposition is due by November 21, 2018, and Defendants' Reply is due by December 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on November 5, 2018. (lctfh3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 11/05 3:48 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to motion to transfer due by 11/21/2018; Reply due by 12/5/2018. (hs) |
||
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to
Fri 11/02 4:44 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Transfer by KAYLA MOORE, ROY STEWART MOORE(Klayman, Larry) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 10/29 5:26 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Pending Resolution of Transfer Motion (ECF No. 6) by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC.(Feder, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 10/29 5:11 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rachel F. Strom, :Firm- Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, :Address- 1251 Avenue of the Americas, 21st Floor, New York, NY 10020. Phone No. - 212-489-8230. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5763594. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC.(Feder, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Rachel F. Strom, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 10/29 4:45 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Elizabeth A. McNamara, :Firm- Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, :Address- 1251 Avenue of the Americas, 21st Floor, New York, NY 10020. Phone No. - 212-489-8230. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5763547. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC.(Feder, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Elizabeth A. McNamara, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Transfer Case
Tue 10/23 5:01 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC.(Feder, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Todd Schulman with Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Brenda Countee with Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 10/01 10:35 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. The deadline for all Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to November 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on October 1, 2018. (lctfh3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 10/01 10:42 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 11/8/2018, (hs) |
||
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 09/28 4:26 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC. (Feder, Eric) |
|
4 | 4
notice
LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Fri 09/28 4:19 PM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CBS CORPORATION, SHOWTIME, INC. (Feder, Eric) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/28 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Feder on behalf of All Defendants (Feder, Eric) |
|
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Wed 09/05 5:50 PM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC..(zsth) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/05 12:57 PM
COMPLAINT against CBS CORPORATION, SACHA NOAM BARON COHEN, SHOWTIME, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5672657) filed by Roy S Moore, Kayla Moore.(Klayman, Larry) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/5/2018) (zsth). Modified on 9/5/2018 (zsth) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 09/05 5:39 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (zsth) |