Kushner v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Algenon L Marbley |
Referred: | Chelsey M Vascura |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-01020 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Sep 07, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 13, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2019 4:29 AM EST |
Defendant
Benefits Administrative Committee, Plan Administrator of the Nationwide-Sponsored Health and Welfare Employee Benefit Plans
One Nationwide Plaza
Columbus, OH 43215 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kurt Kushner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, January 17, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 01/17 10:05 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Kurt Kushner. (Brett, Tybe) |
|
Monday, January 13, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 01/13 1:08 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Opinion and Order signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 1/13/2020. (cw) |
|
22 | 22
10
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Mon 01/13 1:04 PM
ORDER denying18 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting19 Motion for Summary Judgment. All issues in this case are resolved, this case is DISMISSED. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 1/13/2020. (cw) |
|
Friday, May 17, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 05/17 3:48 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re18 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Benefits Administrative Committee, Plan Administrator of the Nationwide-Sponsored Health and Welfare Employee Benefit Plans, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Fask, Sarah) |
|
20 | 20
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 05/17 2:08 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,18 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Kurt Kushner., #6 Exhibit 6 - Maroni Dep. Excerpts) (Brett, Tybe) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Meet and Confer Letters re Administrative Record in Severance case, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Kushner 0382-Kushner 0388 - 2017-11-02 60 Day Notice, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Emails re Severance, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Kushner 0398-Kushner 0399 - 2017-12-21 - Email from Kushner, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - 12.21.2017 Email from KG to TAB | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 04/18 4:34 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Benefits Administrative Committee, Plan Administrator of the Nationwide-Sponsored Health and Welfare Employee Benefit Plans, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Fask, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
18 | 18
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 04/18 12:57 PM
MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Kurt Kushner. (Brett, Tybe) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Kushner II Administrative Record, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 2017-11-02 60 Day Notice, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Email re Severance, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Email from Kushner, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - 2017-12-21 Email to T. Brett, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Maroni Deposition Excerpts, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Meet and Confer Letters, | ||
Att: 8 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order
Wed 01/09 4:34 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 2/8/2019. Motions to Amend due by 2/8/2019. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 2/7/2019. Discovery due by 3/15/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/9/2019. (daf) |
|
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Thu 01/10 8:32 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/9/2019. (agm) |
||
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Thu 12/20 4:44 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Kurt Kushner. (Brett, Tybe) |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 12/13 10:17 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tybe Ann Brett and finding as moot9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tybe Ann Brett. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 12/13/2018. (er) |
||
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Wed 12/12 8:03 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6703281) of Tybe A. Brett by Plaintiff Kurt Kushner. (Merry, Tony) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Monday, December 10, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 12/10 4:45 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: re9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6703281) of Tybe A. Brett (jlk) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 12/10 4:43 PM
Notation Order: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sarah Bryan Faskis GRANTED, conditional upon registration for electronic filing with this Court, or seeking leave to be excused from doing so, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on December 10, 2018. (jlk) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 12/10 4:39 PM
Notation Order: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kimberly Jeanne Gost is GRANTED, conditional upon registration for electronic filing with this Court, or seeking leave to be excused from doing so, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on December 10, 2018. (jlk) |
|
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Fri 12/07 12:08 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6708200) of Sarah Bryan Fask by Defendants Benefits Administrative Committee, Plan Administrator of the Nationwide-Sponsored Health and Welfare Employee Benefit Plans, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Srsic, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing for Sarah Bryan Fask | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Fri 12/07 12:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6708169) of Kimberly J. Gost by Defendants Benefits Administrative Committee, Plan Administrator of the Nationwide-Sponsored Health and Welfare Employee Benefit Plans, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Srsic, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing for Kimberly J. Gost | ||
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Tue 12/04 12:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6703281) of Tybe A. Brett by Plaintiff Kurt Kushner. (Merry, Tony) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate in Good Standing | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 12/04 9:12 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2019 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm) |
|
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 12/03 6:07 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Benefits Administrative Committee, Plan Administrator of the Nationwide-Sponsored Health and Welfare Employee Benefit Plans, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Srsic, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Related Case Memorandum
Wed 10/17 11:29 AM
RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:17-cv-715 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Algenon L. Marbley for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/17/2018. (daf) |
|
Monday, October 08, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 10/08 4:12 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Merry, Tony) |
|
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 10/08 4:10 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Benefits Administrative Committee, Plan Administrator of the Nationwide-Sponsored Health and Welfare Employee Benefit Plans on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Merry, Tony) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order of Recusal
Mon 09/10 1:18 PM
ORDER: Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson recused. Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/10/2018. (ew) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/07 11:56 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6590480), filed by Kurt Kushner. (Merry, Tony) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |