Theiss v. Genesis Roofing Company
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Todd J Campbell |
Referred: | John S Bryant |
Case #: | 3:14-cv-00170 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jan 28, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 07, 2014 9:25 AM CST |
Defendant
Genesis Roofing Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy W. Theiss
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 82 minutes ago |
Friday, April 03, 2015 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 04/03 11:34 AM
Case file destroyed this date. (am) |
||
Wednesday, January 28, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Entry of Judgment - DOCKET CLERK
Wed 01/28 4:08 PM
Entry of Judgment re23 Order (eh) |
|
23 | 23
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 01/28 3:50 PM
ORDER: The parties have filed a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Docket No. 22), indicating that all matters in dispute herein have been resolved. Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED with prejudice, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Any pending Motions are denied as moot. The pretrial conference set for July 24, 2015, and the jury trial set for August 4, 2015, are canceled. This Order shall constitute the final judgment in this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 1/28/2015. (eh) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 01/28 11:19 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Jeremy W. Theiss. (Allman, Andy) |
|
Wednesday, December 17, 2014 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Joint Statement
Wed 12/17 2:17 PM
JOINT Statement Mediation . (Tolbird, Michael) |
|
Thursday, July 17, 2014 | ||
20 | 20 Qualified Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 7/17/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) | |
Bar status for attorney Michael A. Tolbird of TN verified as active on this date. (eh) | ||
Wednesday, July 16, 2014 | ||
19 | 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Andrew Tolbird on behalf of Jeremy W. Theiss (Tolbird, Michael) | |
18 | 18 Memorandum in Support of17 by Genesis Roofing Company.(Leibovich, Robert) Modified on 7/17/2014 (eh). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Plaintiff's Discovery Requests | ||
17 | 17 MOTION for Protective Order by Genesis Roofing Company.(Leibovich, Robert) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order | ||
Friday, July 11, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/4/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge Todd J. Campbell, Pretrial Conference set for 7/24/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Exhibit List due by 7/17/2015, Witness List due by 7/17/2015, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/17/2015. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 7/11/2014. (SEE ORDER FOR OTHER DEADLINES)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) | |
Thursday, July 10, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 ORDER OF RECUSAL: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 294(b), the undersigned is unable or unwilling to undertake this matter. Accordingly, I hereby RECUSE myself and return this case to the Clerk of Court for reassignment to another judge. It is so ORDERED. Case reassigned to District Judge Todd J. Campbell for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 7/9/2014. (eh) | |
Friday, June 20, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re13 First MOTION to Compel filed by Jeremy W. Theiss. (Allman, Andy) | |
Monday, June 09, 2014 | ||
NOTE TO FILER re: DE #13 . This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word of WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. Future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (eh) | ||
Friday, June 06, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 First MOTION to Compel by Genesis Roofing Company.(Williams, Jeffrey) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Genesis' discovery requests, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit JL email, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit JW letter, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Email with proposed joint statement | ||
Tuesday, April 01, 2014 | ||
Bar status for attorney Robert Joseph Leibovich of TN verified as active on this date. (eh) | ||
Monday, March 31, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 ANSWER to1 Complaint by Genesis Roofing Company.(Leibovich, Robert) | |
Monday, March 17, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/4/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Senior Judge John T. Nixon, Pretrial Conference set for 7/24/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Senior Judge John T. Nixon.Amended Pleadings due by 9/16/2014, Discovery due by 11/17/2014, Motions due by 3/17/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 3/17/2014.(SEE ORDER FOR OTHER DEADLINES) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) | |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/17/2014. ICMO to enter. (Tape #2014-12 JSB) (tm) | ||
Wednesday, March 12, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Jeremy W. Theiss. (Allman, Andy) | |
Friday, March 07, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Williams on behalf of Genesis Roofing Company (Williams, Jeffrey) | |
Bar status for attorney Jeffrey M. Williams of TN verified as active on this date. (eh) | ||
Thursday, March 06, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 CERTIFICATE of service filed by Genesis Roofing Company re5 Notice of Appearance filed by Genesis Roofing Company. (Leibovich, Robert) | |
Bar status for attorney Robert Joseph Leibovich of TN verified as active on this date. (eh) | ||
Note to Filer re DE# 5: Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (eh) | ||
Wednesday, March 05, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Jeremy W. Theiss. Genesis Roofing Company served on 3/1/2014. (Allman, Andy) | |
6 | 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Genesis Roofing Company. (Leibovich, Robert) | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Leibovich on behalf of Genesis Roofing Company (Leibovich, Robert) | |
Friday, January 24, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 RECEIPT #34675030035 in the amount of $400 re1 Complaint. (eh) | |
Thursday, January 23, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 776 before Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant. (eh) | |
2 | 2 NOTICE from USDC Clerk regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement requirement (eh) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Genesis Roofing Company, filed by Jeremy W. Theiss. Filing fee paid $400. Summons issued.(eh) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
Bar status for attorney Andy Allman of TN verified as active on this date. (eh) |