Borkowski et al v. Baltimore County, Maryland et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Deborah K Chasanow |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-02809 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 10, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 29, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2019 4:14 AM EST |
Defendant
Rosemarie Brady
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark Sparks
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
University of Maryland Baltimore County Police Department
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Terrence Sheridan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott Shellenberger
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kimberly Montgomery
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Timothy Lee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Morrow Lane
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Freeman Hrabowski, III
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kristin Burrows
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
University of Maryland, Baltimore County
1000 Hilltop Circle
Baltimore, MD 21250 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nicholas Tomas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland
3300 Metzerrot Road
Adelphi, MD 20783 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Krystin Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bernadette Hunton
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bonnie Fox
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Paul Dorfler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Paul Dillon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lisa Dever
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Baltimore County, Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Baltimore County Police Department
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcella Fegler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Annemarie Hendler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katelyn Frank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kaila Noland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anna Borkowski
|
Represented By
|
1. | Baltimore County pledged to change rape investigations but lawsuit draws questions about those reforms (baltimoresun.com) |
Submitted Tue 09/25/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
191 | 191
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 11/29 11:52 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice, of Claims by Anna Borkowski(Baldwin, Rignal) |
|
190 | 190
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 11/29 10:30 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice, of Claims by Anna Borkowski(Baldwin, Rignal) |
|
order
Order
Tue 11/29 1:18 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING191 Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice of Plaintiff Anna Borkowski's claims. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 11/29/2022. (Chasanow, Deborah) |