Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Gordon J Quist
Referred: Ellen S Carmody
Case #: 1:18-cv-01046
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 11, 2018 1:11 AM EDT
defendant
Board of Trustees of Michigan State University
defendant
Douglas Dietzel, D.O.
defendant
John Geddert
defendant
Kathie Klages
defendant
Jeffrey R Kovan, D.O.
defendant
Brooke Lemmen, D.O.
defendant
Michigan State University
defendant
Lawrence Gerard Nassar
defendant
Gary E Stollak
defendant
William D Strampel, D.O.
defendant
Destiny Teachnor-Hauk
defendant
Twistars USA, Inc. d/b/a Gedderts' Twistars USA Gymnastics Club
defendant
USA Gynnastics, Inc.
plaintiff
Erika Davis
Represented By
Steven C. Hurbis
Mckeen & Associates PC
contact info

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, October 22, 2018
90 90 motion Proposed Order Mon 4:55 PM
PROPOSED ORDER regarding Extension to Respond to Defendant Gedderts' Twistar Gymnastics Club USA's Motion to Dismiss by plaintiff Jane M.P. Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Damico, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
89 89 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Mon 10:39 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER by plaintiff Jane NLF-2 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew)
Related: [-]
88 88 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Mon 10:36 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER by plaintiff Jane NLF-1 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 19, 2018
87 87 respm Response to Motion Fri 2:13 PM
RESPONSE TO JOINT MOTION for discovery (156 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 173 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 174 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 77 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 213 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 161 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 163 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 90 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 161 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC) filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
Related: [-]
86 86 respm Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence Fri 1:53 PM
CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file excess pages USAG Motion for leave to file an Over-length brief (38 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC) filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
Related: [-]
85 85 respm Brief in Support of a Motion Fri 1:46 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION for leave to file excess pages USAG Motion for leave to file an Over-length brief (38 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC) Brief in Support of USAG Motion for Leave to File an Over-length Brief filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
Related: [-]
84 84 motion File Excess Pages Fri 1:40 PM
MOTION for leave to file excess pages USAG Motion for leave to file an Over-length brief by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
Related: [-]
83 83 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 1:06 PM
ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (463), (464) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
Related: [-]
82 82 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Fri 12:50 PM
ORDER FINDING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND BARRING CONTRIBUTION CLAIMS (393) in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; granting (350) motion for order in case 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC; granting (340) motion for order in case 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC; granting (350) motion for order in case 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC; granting (338) motion for order in case 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC; granting (338) motion for order in case 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC; granting (331) motion for order in case 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC; granting (268) motion for order in case 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC; granting (253) motion for order in case 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC; granting (119) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC; granting (177) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC; granting (177) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC; granting (177) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC; granting (168) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC; granting (166) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC; granting (142) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC; granting (177) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC; granting (17) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC; granting (133) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC; granting (140) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC; granting (135) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC; granting (109) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC; granting (93) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC; granting (98) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC; granting (11) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC; granting (101) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC; granting (14) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC; granting (94) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC; granting (15) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC; granting (36) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC; granting (14) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC; granting (19) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC; granting (16) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC; granting (23) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC; granting (21) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC; granting (28) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC; granting (68) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC; granting (20) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC; granting (28) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC; granting (68) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC; granting (10) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC; granting (7) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC; granting (10) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC; granting (14) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00971-GJQ-ESC; granting (22) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC; granting (39) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC; granting (14) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC; granting (15) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC; granting (21) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC; granting (16) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC; granting (20) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC; granting (19) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC; granting (12) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC; granting (8) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC; granting (10) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC; granting (9) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC; granting (8) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC; granting (8) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC; granting (10) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC; granting (9) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC; granting (11) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC; granting (8) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC; granting (9) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC; granting (16) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC; granting (12) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC; granting (10) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC; granting (18) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC; granting (12) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC; granting (10) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC; granting (12) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC; granting (11) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC; granting (11) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC; granting (11) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC; granting (21) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC; granting (10) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01028-GJQ-ESC; granting (11) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC; granting (8) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC; granting (18) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC; granting (10) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC; granting (8) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC; granting (11) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC; granting (10) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC; granting (9) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC; granting (7) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC; granting (12) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC; granting (8) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC; granting (15) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC; granting (10) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC; granting (10) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC; granting (10) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC; granting (9) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC; granting (9) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC; granting (12) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC; granting (14) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC; granting (10) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC; granting (9) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC; granting (9) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC; granting (9) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC; granting (11) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC; granting (9) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC; granting (10) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC; granting (10) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC; granting (10) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC; granting (10) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC; granting (10) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC; granting (9) motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 18, 2018
81 81 misc Affidavit Thu 11:40 AM
AFFIDAVIT in Support of Request for Entry of Default by plaintiff Jane J-1 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bass, Michelle)
Related: [-]
80 80 motion Application for Entry of Default Thu 11:34 AM
APPLICATION for entry of default as to Defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bass, Michelle)
Related: [-]
79 79 order Default (Entry of) Thu 10:42 AM
DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar Related [+] ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mla)
Related: [-] 1:18-cv-822
Wednesday, October 17, 2018
78 78 respm Brief in Support of a Motion Wed 3:23 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION for order to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel re 842, 851, 1008, and 1019 (454 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) AMENDED filed by Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Eldridge, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H
77 77 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Wed 2:50 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendants Twistars and Geddert an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
Related: [-]
76 76 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Wed 2:41 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendants Twistars and Geddert an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
Related: [-]
75 75 motion Application for Entry of Default Wed 10:45 AM
APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
74 74 misc Notify Attorney Notice Wed 9:40 AM
NOTICE to attorney Scott Robert Eldridge regarding recent filing ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 16, 2018
73 73 respm Brief in Support of a Motion Tue 11:34 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION for order to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel re 842, 851, 1008, and 1019 (454 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) AMENDED filed by Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Eldridge, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-K
70 70 respm Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence Tue 4:07 PM
CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel re 842, 851, 1008, and 1019 (454 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Eldridge, Scott)
Related: [-]
69 69 misc Brief (Related Document) Tue 4:03 PM
BRIEF by defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees in Support of Motion to Disqualify Plaintiffs' Counsel re 842, 851, 1008, and 1019; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Eldridge, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-K
67 67 2 pgs motion Order Tue 3:56 PM
MOTION for order to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel re 1:18-cv-842, 1:18-cv-851, 1:18-cv-1008, and 1:18-cv-1019 by defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Eldridge, Scott) Modified text on 10/16/2018 (mg)
Related: [-]
66 66 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation to Dismiss Tue 12:42 PM
ORDER granting STIPULATION to dismiss (445) Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Twistars USA without prejudice in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
Related: [-]
65 65 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 12:30 PM
ORDER granting STIPULATION (443) dismissing Plaintiff's claims against Defendant USAG with prejudice in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
Related: [-]
64 64 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 12:06 PM
ORDER granting STIPULATION (440) to withdraw and refile in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
Related: [-]
63 63 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 12:04 PM
ORDER granting STIPULATION (439) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
Related: [-]
62 62 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 12:01 PM
ORDER granting STIPULATION (438) to file excess pages in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
Related: [-]
61 61 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 11:24 AM
STIPULATION of dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendants Twistars USA and John John Geddert by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 15, 2018
60 60 misc Consolidated Case - Document Affecting Parties In Member Case Mon 1:34 PM
USA Gymnastics, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint with affirmative defenses filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Portinga, D.) in case number 1:18-cv-915, document number 74 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
Related: [-]
59 59 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Mon 1:27 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal in Member Case Number 1:18-cv-01046 by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
Related: [-]