Roche Diagnostics Corporation et al v. Priority Healthcare Corporation et al
Alabama Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Karon O Bowdre |
Referred: | Herman N Johnson, Jr |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-01479 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 09, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 06, 2019 4:02 PM CST |
Defendant
Priority Care Pharmacy Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Medpoint Pharmacy Benefit Managers
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Konie Minga
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ozark Family Pharmacy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Priority Care Medical Supply LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Priority Care Pharmacy 2 LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Priority Care Pharmacy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amory Discount Pharmacy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Priority Care Pharmacy Solutions LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Priority Care Pharmacy at Cotton Gin Point LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Priority Healthcare Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tombigbee Pharmacy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vickers Priority Care Pharmacy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vincent Express Care Pharmacy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vincent Priority Care Pharmacy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Medical Park Pharmacy Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amory Priority Care Pharmacy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
B&K Express Care Pharmacy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
B&K Priority Care Pharmacy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Daniel Baker
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bowies Express Care Pharmacy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bowies Priority Care Pharmacy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Burns Discount Drug Store LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Burns Drugstore Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carbon Hill Express Care Pharmacy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kimberly P Carson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Samuel Phillip Carson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jasper Express Care Pharmacy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Main Street Drugs LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Medical Park Discount Pharmacy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Medpoint Advantage LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roche Diabetes Care Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roche Diagnostics Corporation
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Phillip Anthony Minga
Terminated: 09/27/2019
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wesley Minga
Terminated: 09/27/2019
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Geneva Oswalt
Terminated: 09/27/2019
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Melissa Sheffield
Terminated: 09/27/2019
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ashley Tigrett
Terminated: 09/27/2019
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
William H Austin
Terminated: 09/27/2019
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christopher Daniel Knotts
Terminated: 09/27/2019
1212 Cowden Drive
Amory, MS 38821 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/02/2022 5:10 AM CDT |
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 58 pgs COMPLAINT against Amory Discount Pharmacy LLC, Amory Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, William H Austin, B&K Express Care Pharmacy LLC, B&K Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Daniel Baker, Bowies Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Bowies Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Burns Discount Drug Store LLC, Burns Drugstore Inc, Carbon Hill Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Kimberly P Carson, Samuel Phillip Carson, Jasper Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Christopher Daniel Knotts, Main Street Drugs LLC, Medical Park Discount Pharmacy LLC, Medical Park Pharmacy Inc, Medpoint Advantage LLC, Medpoint Pharmacy Benefit Managers, Konie Minga, Phillip Anthony Minga, Wesley Minga, Geneva Oswalt, Ozark Family Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Medical Supply LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy 2 LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Services LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Solutions LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy at Cotton Gin Point LLC, Priority Healthcare Corporation, Melissa Sheffield, Ashley Tigrett, Tombigbee Pharmacy LLC, Vickers Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation.(KEK) | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (KEK) | |
3 | 3 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Karon O. Bowdre. Please use case number 2:18-cv-1479-KOB on all subsequent pleadings. (KEK) | |
4 | 4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Canupp, David) | |
5 | 5 AFFIDAVIT in Support re4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Kimberly Ober filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Canupp, David) | |
6 | 6 AFFIDAVIT in Support re4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Kerri McAleavey filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation.(Canupp, David) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 | ||
7 | 7 AFFIDAVIT in Support re4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Kelly Clawson filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Canupp, David) | |
8 | 8 4 pgs AFFIDAVIT in Support re4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Geoffrey Potter filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation.(Canupp, David) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Errata 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 18, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 19, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 20, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 21, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit 22, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit 23, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit 24, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit 25, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit 26, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit 27, | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit 28 | ||
9 | 9 AFFIDAVIT in Support re4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Robert E. Haley, III filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation.(Canupp, David) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 18, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 19, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 20, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 21 | ||
10 | 10 Brief re4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Canupp, David) | |
11 | 11 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Expedited Discovery [Dkt. No. 10] by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Canupp, David) | |
12 | 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Geoffrey Potter by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation.(Canupp, David) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing | ||
13 | 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Aron Fischer by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation.(Canupp, David) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing | ||
14 | 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Timothy Gray by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation.(Canupp, David) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing | ||
15 | 15 TEXT ORDER. Telephone Conference set for Tuesday, September 11, 2018 at 03:30 PM before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre. The call in information has been provided to plffs local counsel. Local counsel has been directed to provide the information to all other parties. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/11/2018. (FNC) | |
16 | 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre: Telephone Conference held on 9/11/2018. Geoff Potter, Aron Fischer and David Canupp, for plffs and Al Delgadillo and Rick Culp for defs participated in phone conference. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Lindy Fuller.) (FNC) |