Lewis v. Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Referred: | James L Cott |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-08336 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332pl Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2019 4:53 AM EDT |
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bayer OY
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Plaintiff
Laryna Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
order
Judgment - Clerk
Tue 07/09 10:33 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (16 in 1:18-cv-08320-PAE-JLC, 18 in 1:18-cv-08272-PAE-JLC, 10 in 1:18-cv-08326-PAE-JLC, 17 in 1:18-cv-08292-PAE-JLC, 14 in 1:18-cv-08268-PAE-JLC, 17 in 1:18-cv-08269-PAE-JLC, 15 in 1:18-cv-08334-PAE-JLC, 16 in 1:18-cv-08318-PAE-JLC, 17 in 1:18-cv-08310-PAE-JLC, 16 in 1:18-cv-08307-PAE-JLC, 10 in 1:18-cv-08328-PAE-JLC, 17 in 1:18-cv-08271-PAE-JLC, 22 in 1:18-cv-08312-PAE-JLC, 15 in 1:18-cv-08336-PAE-JLC, 11 in 1:18-cv-08287-PAE-JLC, 10 in 1:18-cv-08327-PAE-JLC, 16 in 1:18-cv-08265-PAE-JLC, 10 in 1:18-cv-08330-PAE-JLC, 21 in 1:18-cv-08240-PAE-JLC, 10 in 1:18-cv-08325-PAE-JLC, 10 in 1:18-cv-08331-PAE-JLC, 19 in 1:18-cv-08276-PAE-JLC, 10 in 1:18-cv-08329-PAE-JLC, 17 in 1:18-cv-08262-PAE-JLC, 16 in 1:18-cv-08340-PAE-JLC) Memorandum & Opinion. in favor of Bayer Health Care Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer OY, Bayer Oy, Bayer Pharam AG, Bayer Pharm AG, Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer healthcare pharmaceuticals, inc. against Amber Large, Carolendia Bates, Carrie Breaux, Chandra Mason, Clarity Pavon-Moore, Cosette Posorski, Davita Robinson, Dyonche Willis, Jennifer Ducre, Jennifer Sisson, Jessica Jett, Julie Spencer, Kalena Williams, Khalilah Bowens, Laryna Lewis, Leah Southard, Madonna Lynn Dugas, Marian Cale, Michelle Rutherford, Nicole Major, Rosean Moore, Roxanne Bendick, Schameka Santa Cruze, Tanika Rhodes, Trichelle Harrison Robinson.It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion & Order dated June 11, 2019, Bayer's motion for summary judgment is granted and all remaining member cases in this MDL are closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 6/21/2019)(kv) |
|
Att: 1 Right to Appeal | ||
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
55
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Tue 06/11 1:16 PM
OPINION & ORDER re: (328 in 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bayer Oy, Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. For the reasons stated above, Bayer's motion for summary judgment is granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending motion (No. 17 MD 2767, Dkt. 328), and to enter judgment in and close all remaining member cases in this MDL. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/11/2019) **Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(anc) |
|
14 | 14
55
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Tue 06/11 8:55 AM
OPINION & ORDER re: (328 in 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bayer Oy, Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. For the reasons stated above, Bayer's motion for summary judgment is granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending motion (No. 17 MD 2767, Dkt. 328), and to enter judgment in and close all remaining member cases in this MDL. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/11/2019) **Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(anc) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 03/15 2:57 PM
ORDER granting (343) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC; granting (134) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02674-PAE-JLC; granting (119) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02694-PAE-JLC; granting (88) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02705-PAE-JLC; granting (82) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02715-PAE-JLC; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02718-PAE-JLC; granting (81) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02737-PAE-JLC; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02745-PAE-JLC; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02812-PAE-JLC; granting (73) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02813-PAE-JLC; granting (70) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02814-PAE-JLC; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02816-PAE-JLC; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02819-PAE-JLC; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02821-PAE-JLC; granting (69) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02826-PAE-JLC; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02827-PAE-JLC; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02861-PAE-JLC; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02865-PAE-JLC; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02866-PAE-JLC; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02891-PAE-JLC; granting (131) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02900-PAE-JLC; granting (113) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02916-PAE-JLC; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02943-PAE-JLC; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02945-PAE-JLC; granting (137) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02947-PAE-JLC; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02950-PAE-JLC; granting (64) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02952-PAE-JLC; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02961-PAE-JLC; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02962-PAE-JLC; granting (64) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02992-PAE-JLC; granting (75) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02993-PAE-JLC; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02994-PAE-JLC; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03067-PAE-JLC; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03068-PAE-JLC; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03069-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03072-PAE-JLC; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03074-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03080-PAE-JLC; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03083-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03084-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03085-PAE-JLC; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03087-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03088-PAE-JLC; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03124-PAE-JLC; granting (192) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03125-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03143-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03146-PAE-JLC; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03147-PAE-JLC; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03216-PAE-JLC; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03219-PAE-JLC; granting (84) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03231-PAE-JLC; granting (155) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03233-PAE-JLC; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03236-PAE-JLC; granting (99) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03238-PAE-JLC; granting (83) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03240-PAE-JLC; granting (88) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03242-PAE-JLC; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03298-PAE-JLC; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03334-PAE-JLC; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03335-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03354-PAE-JLC; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03390-PAE-JLC; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03497-PAE-JLC; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03499-PAE-JLC; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04301-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04579-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04581-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04582-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04583-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04584-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04597-PAE-JLC; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04967-PAE-JLC; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04981-PAE-JLC; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05090-PAE-JLC; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05138-PAE-JLC; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05335-PAE-JLC; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05338-PAE-JLC; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05345-PAE-JLC; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05762-PAE-JLC; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05763-PAE-JLC; granting (77) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-06638-PAE-JLC; granting (29) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-06714-PAE-JLC; granting (31) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-07149-PAE-JLC; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-07447-PAE-JLC; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-07449-PAE-JLC; granting (25) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-07877-PAE-JLC; granting (23) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-08399-PAE-JLC; granting (25) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-08479-PAE-JLC; granting (25) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-08487-PAE-JLC; granting (23) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-08714-PAE-JLC; granting (22) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-09698-PAE-JLC; granting (20) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-10241-PAE-JLC; granting (19) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-00349-PAE-JLC; granting (16) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-02782-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-02885-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-03784-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-03796-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-03847-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-03860-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04067-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04627-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04655-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04713-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04721-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04766-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04792-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04794-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04842-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04976-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-05698-PAE-JLC; granting (15) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-06415-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-06732-PAE-JLC; granting (19) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-07330-PAE-JLC; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-07774-PAE-JLC; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08658-PAE-JLC; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08888-PAE-JLC; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08893-PAE-JLC; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08895-PAE-JLC; granting (17) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08899-PAE-JLC; granting (16) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08902-PAE-JLC; granting (12) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-09607-PAE-JLC; granting (11) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-12373-PAE-JLC. It is hereby ORDERED that Ms. Natale's Motion is GRANTED and she is hereby terminated from these actions. The Clerk is notified to terminate Ms. Natale from all further notices in these actions. So entered this 15th day of March 2019. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/15/2019) **Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al. (anc) |
|
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 10/25 10:05 AM
ORDER: The Court directs counsel promptly to meet and confer as to next steps in this multi-district litigation. The Court asks counsel to consider whether, as in the earlier multi-district litigation involving Mirena presided over by Judge Seibel, this case should now proceed to motions for summary judgment limited to the issue of general causation. A joint letter, setting forth the parties' proposal(s) as to next steps, is due Friday, November 9, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/24/2018)***Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(anc) |
|
11 | 11
156
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Wed 10/24 10:54 AM
OPINION & ORDER re: (134, 136, 138, 141, 143, 145, 147, 149, 151, 153, 155,158, 160, 162, 165, 168, 170, 172, and 175 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC) MOTIONS to exclude testimony filed by Bayer Oy, Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants Bayer's motion to exclude the testimony of plaintiffs' seven general-causation witnesses, and denies, as potentially moot, plaintiffs' motions to exclude Bayer's 12 general-causation witnesses. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at Dkts. 134, 136, 138, 141, 143, 145, 147, 149, 151, 153, 155, 158, 160, 162, 165, 168, 170, 172, and 175. An order as to next steps in this case will follow shortly. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/24/2018) **Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(anc) Modified on 10/24/2018 (anc) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 09/17 7:56 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Per chambers instructions) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 06/23/2017) (sjo) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Fri 09/14 12:39 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bayer Pharma AG. (jgo) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Fri 09/14 12:39 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bayer OY. (jgo) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Fri 09/14 12:38 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (jgo) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 09/14 9:47 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 09/14 9:48 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
Fri 09/14 9:48 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 17-md-2767. (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Accepted as Related
Fri 09/14 11:13 AM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Fri 09/14 11:14 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 09/14 11:14 AM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (wb) |
||
utility
Case Consolidation - MDL
Mon 09/17 7:51 AM
CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC. (sjo) |
||
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 09/13 3:01 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bayer Pharma AG, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Laryna Lewis. (Robertson, Alexandra) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 09/13 3:01 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bayer OY, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Laryna Lewis. (Robertson, Alexandra) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 09/13 3:00 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Laryna Lewis. (Robertson, Alexandra) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 09/13 2:59 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Robertson, Alexandra) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Statement of Relatedness
Thu 09/13 1:47 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:17-md-02767. Document filed by Laryna Lewis.(Robertson, Alexandra) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/13 1:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer OY, Bayer Pharma AG. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15565417)Document filed by Laryna Lewis.(Robertson, Alexandra) |