ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY AFFILIATED PLANS et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Richard J Leon |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-02133 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Actions |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 19, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2019 5:08 AM EDT |
Amicus
AARP FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
HIV MEDICINE ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
HEMOPHILIA FEDERATION OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
GLOBAL HEALTHY LIVING
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
EPILEPSY FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
CYSTIC FIBROSIS FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
AMERICAN OSTEOPATHIC ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY CANCER ACTION NETWORK
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
AARP
601 E St. NW
Washington, DC 20049 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
LEUKEMIA & LYMPHOMA SOCIETY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
MARCH OF DIMES FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
MEDICAL SOCIETY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
NATIONAL COALITION FOR CANCER SURVIVORSHIP
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
NATIONAL MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS SOCIETY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
200 Constitution Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20210 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
STEVEN MNUCHIN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ALEX M. AZAR, II
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NATIONAL PARTNERSHIP FOR WOMEN & FAMILIES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NATIONAL ALLIANCE ON MENTAL ILLNESS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MENTAL HEALTH AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LITTLE LOBBYISTS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY AFFILIATED PLANS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AIDS UNITED
|
Represented By
|
1. | Two New Lawsuits Challenge Trump Administration Actions On Health Reform (healthaffairs.org) |
Submitted Mon 09/17/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 03, 2021 | ||
61 | 61
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 02/05 1:26 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to59 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by LITTLE LOBBYISTS, LLC, AIDS UNITED, MENTAL HEALTH AMERICA, ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY AFFILIATED PLANS, AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL ALLIANCE ON MENTAL ILLNESS, NATIONAL PARTNERSHIP FOR WOMEN & FAMILIES ; USCA Case Number 19-5212 (zjf) |
|
Att: 1 USCA Judgment |