Ambac Financial Group, Inc.
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:10-bk-15973 |
Case Filed: | Nov 08, 2010 |
Terminated: | Jan 06, 2014 |
Plan Confirmed: | Mar 14, 2012 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | Over 100,000 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | More than $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Ambac Financial Group, Inc.
1 State St
New York, NY 10004-1561 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Claims and Noticing Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
2335 Alaska Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
|
Creditor Committee
The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Trustee
The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee and Successor Trustee
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
33 Whitehall Street 21st Floor
New York, NY 10004 |
Represented By
|
GPO
Sep 23 2011
Bench Decision Approving Settlement Stipulation and Insurer Agreement signed on 9/23/2011. (related document(s)558) (Chien, Jason) |
Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago |
Tuesday, January 07, 2014 | ||
Receipt of Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (CLAIMS AGENT CASES ONLY) 10-15973 scc) [claims,transclm] ( 25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 9859528. Fee amount 25.00. (U.S. Treasury) | ||
Monday, January 06, 2014 | ||
1394 | 1394 Affidavit of Service re: 1) Order Terminating Services of Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC as Claims and Noticing Agent [Docket No. 1391]; and 2) Order of Final Decree Closing the Debtor's Chapter 11 Case Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 105(a) and 350(a), Rule 3022 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, and Rule 3022-1 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules for the Southern District of New York [Docket No. 1392] filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Gershbein, Evan) | |
1393 | 1393 Transfer Agreement FRBP. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: One State Street, LLC (Amount $14,007,368.00) To Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Olinsky, Jeffrey) | |
Case Closed. (Rodriguez, Maria). |