Brown v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Paul G Byron |
Referred: | Karla R Spaulding |
Case #: | 6:18-cv-01537 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Sep 17, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 18, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2019 7:03 AM EDT |
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathryn Brown
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Thu 10/18 9:47 AM
ORDER granting as unopposed 11 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. This case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of the Seventh Judicial Circuit in and for Volusia County, Florida. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a certified copy of this Order to the Clerk of Court for the Circuit Court of the Seventh Judicial Circuit in and for Volusia County, Florida. The Clerk of Court is thereafter DIRECTED to terminate all pending deadlines and close the file.. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/18/2018. (JRJ) |
|
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Remand to State Court
Tue 10/02 2:58 PM
First MOTION to remand to State Court by Kathryn Brown.(Pimenta, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Wed 09/26 4:25 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re9 Interested persons order dated September 19, 2018 by Kathryn Brown. (Pimenta, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Interested persons order
Wed 09/19 11:05 AM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/19/2018. (GNB) |
|
8 | 8
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Wed 09/19 11:04 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/19/2018. (GNB) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Tue 09/18 4:25 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Stores, Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.. (Alexander, Kurt) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Tue 09/18 4:24 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. Related case(s): no (Alexander, Kurt) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 09/18 10:27 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 4 Complaint with Jury Demand filed in State Court on 4/16/2018 by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(DMA) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/18 10:24 AM
COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP with Jury Demand filed State Court on 3/20/2018 by Kathryn Brown.(DMA) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit
Tue 09/18 10:23 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Brenda Jones re:1 Notice of Removal by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (DMA) |
|
2 | 2
5
pgs
respm
Memorandum in support
Tue 09/18 10:21 AM
MEMORANDUM in support re1 Notice of Removal filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (DMA) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 09/18 10:15 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Volusia County Court, case number 201830440CICI filed in State Court on 3/20/2018. Filing fee $400, receipt number ORL076958 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (DMA) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit State Court Docs, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet |