Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Vincent L Briccetti |
Case #: | 7:18-cv-08591 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Sep 19, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 28, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2019 4:36 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Terminated - Submitted
Thu 11/29 7:32 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 11/28/2018 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (km) |
|
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 11/28 9:29 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) John Doe. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). . (James, Jacqueline) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted
Mon 10/15 3:17 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pne) |
|
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Tue 10/09 5:37 PM
ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE granting5 Letter Motion for Discovery. Plaintiff may serve the ISP with a Rule 45 subpoena commanding the ISP to provide Plaintiff with the true name and address of the Defendant to whom the ISP assigned an IP address as set forth in the Complaint. Plaintiff shall attach to any such subpoena a copy of this Order. Clerk shall terminate the motion. (Doc. #5). (As further set forth herein.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 10/9/2018) (kgo) |
|
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
14
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Fri 10/05 1:57 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:5 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference . . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
5 | 5
motion
Discovery
Fri 10/05 1:56 PM
MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Thu 09/20 4:26 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit AO 120 Form/AO 121 Form
Thu 09/20 12:34 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Jacqueline Marie James to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (sj) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 09/20 12:38 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (sj) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 09/20 12:39 PM
Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (sj) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 09/20 12:39 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sj) |
||
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 09/19 11:18 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 09/19 11:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (James, Jacqueline) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/19 11:16 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15593054)Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A |