USA v. Villasenor
California Northern District Court | |
Case #: | 3:18-cr-00437 |
Case Filed: | Sep 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 12, 2019 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 20, 2018 12:19 AM PDT |
Defendant
Brian Gutierrez Villasenor (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2021 2:48 PM PDT |
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 13 pgs COMPLAINT as to Brian Guiterrez Villasenor (1). (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (lskS, COURT STAFF). [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | |
2 | 2 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Brian Guiterrez Villasenor. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (lskS, COURT STAFF). [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | |
3 | 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Seal Case as to Brian Guiterrez Villasenor (1) Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/16/18. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (lskS, COURT STAFF). [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | |
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Brian Guiterrez Villasenor re1 Complaint Initial Appearance set for 5/17/2018 04:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | ||
4 | 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Brian Guiterrez Villasenor (lskS, COURT STAFF) [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | |
5 | 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Initial Appearance and ID of Counsel Hearing as to Brian Guiterrez Villasenor held on 5/17/2018. Detention Hearing and Status Conference set for 5/23/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. FTR Time 3:52 - 3:58. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (lskS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/23/2018 (lskS, COURT STAFF). [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | |
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (lskS, COURT STAFF) [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | ||
8 | 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: ID of Counsel Hearing as to Brian Guiterrez Villasenor held on 5/23/2018, James Bustamante special appear. Detention Hearing as to Brian Guiterrez Villasenor held on 5/23/2018, remanded to custody. Detention Hearing set for 5/25/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Set preliminary hearing set for 5/31/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. I.D. of Counsel Hearing set for 5/25/2018 09:30AMin San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. FTR Time 9:25-9:29. Govt motion to unseal entire case granted. (lskS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 5/23/2018 (lskS, COURT STAFF). [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | |
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Brian Gutierrez Villasenor Preliminary Examination set for 8/3/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | ||
9 | 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: ID of Counsel Hearing as to Brian Guiterrez Villasenor not held on 5/25/2018. Detention Hearing and Status Conference as to Brian Guiterrez Villasenor held on 5/25/2018 Attorney Appointment Hearing and Detention Hearing set for 6/8/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Preliminary Examination set for 8/3/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. FTR Time 10:14 - 10:18. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | |
10 | 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY HEARING, EXTENDING TIME UNDER RULE 5.1, AND EXCLUDING TIME UNDER THE SPEEDY TRIAL ACT as to Brian Guiterrez Villasenor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/25/18. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | |
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
11 | 11 MOTION to Remand Government's Motion for Detention by USA as to Brian Guiterrez Villasenor. Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero.(Lin, Rita) [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
12 | 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: ID of Counsel Hearing as to Brian Gutierrez Villasenor NOT held on 6/8/2018 Status Conference as to Brian Gutierrez Villasenor held on 6/8/2018. Detention Hearing as to Brian Gutierrez Villasenor NOT held on 6/8/2018. Motion Hearing as to Brian Gutierrez Villasenor NOT held on 6/8/2018 re11 MOTION to Remand Government's Motion for Detention filed by USA Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Detention Hearing set for 6/15/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. I.D. of Counsel Hearing set for 6/15/2018 10:30AMin San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. FTR Time 11:26-11:28. (klhS, COURT STAFF) [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | |
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
13 | 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: ID of Counsel Hearing, Detention Hearing and Motion Hearing as to Brian Gutierrez Villasenor not held on 6/15/2018. Detention Hearing, I.D. of Counsel Hearing and Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2018 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. FTR Time 11:03-11:05. Plaintiff Attorney: Rita Lin. Defendant Attorney: James Bustamante. Defendant Present: Yes. Defendant in Custody: Yes. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | |
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
14 | 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Detention Hearing as to Brian Gutierrez Villasenor held on 6/22/2018, ID of Counsel Hearing as to Brian Gutierrez Villasenor NOT held on 6/22/2018. Motion Hearing as to Brian Gutierrez Villasenor held on 6/22/2018 re11 MOTION to Remand Government's Motion for Detention filed by USA I.D. of Counsel Hearing set for 7/13/2018 10:30AMin San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. FTR Time 10:37-11:14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | |
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
15 | 15 Proposed Order by USA as to Brian Gutierrez Villasenor Regarding Detention (Lin, Rita) [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | |
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
16 | 16 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Brian Gutierrez Villasenor. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/27/18. (klhS, COURT STAFF) [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | |
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
Attorney update in case as to Brian Gutierrez Villasenor. Attorney Ruben Torres Munoz for Brian Gutierrez Villasenor added. Attorney Daniel Paul Blank terminated. (klhS, COURT STAFF) [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | ||
17 | 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: ID of Counsel Hearing as to Brian Gutierrez Villasenor held on 7/13/2018. Ruben Munoz is now counsel of record. Prelim. Hearing or Arraignment prev. set for 8/3/18 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline S. Corley, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. FTR Time 11:30-11:31. Plaintiff Attorney: Helen Gilbert for Rita Lin. Defendant Attorney: Ruben Munoz, retained. Defendant Present: Yes. Defendant in Custody: Yes. Attachment Minute Order. (klhS, COURT STAFF) [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | |
18 | 18 PDF with attached Audio File. Audio as to Defendant (1) Brian Gutierrez Villasenor. Court Date & Time [ 7/13/2018 11:30:10 AM ]. File Size [ 472 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:59 ]. (courtspeak). [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | |
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Brian Gutierrez Villasenor re10 Stipulation and Order, Set/Reset Hearings 8/3/18 at 9:30 AM before Judge Spero. Preliminary Examination set for 8/3/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (klhS, COURT STAFF)NOTE: Corrects clerk's error. Matter is to be set before Judge Corley, not Judge Spero. [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | ||
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
19 | 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Brian Gutierrez Villasenor Continuing Preliminary Hearing, Extending Time under Rule 5.1, and Excluding Time Under the Speedy Trial Act filed by USA. (Gilbert, Helen) [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | |
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Brian Gutierrez Villasenor Arraignment set for 9/7/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Preliminary Examination set for 9/7/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | ||
20 | 20 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 19 Stipulation as to Brian Gutierrez Villasenor. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | |
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
21 | 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Brian Gutierrez Villasenor To Continue Preliminary Hearing, Extend Time Under Rule 5.1, and Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act filed by USA. (Gilbert, Helen) [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | |
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Brian Gutierrez Villasenor Arraignment set for 9/28/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom D, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Preliminary Examination set for 9/28/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom D, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. (shyS, COURT STAFF) [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | ||
22 | 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Preliminary Hearing, Extending Time Under Rule 5.1, and Excluding Time Under the Speedy Trial Act signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) [3:18-mj-70674-JCS] | |
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
23 | 23 INFORMATION as to Brian Gutierrez Villasenor (1) count(s) 1, 2. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) | |
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet |