Provost v. First Guaranty Bank
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jay C Zainey |
Referred: | Donna Phillips Currault |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-08845 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 15:1691 Equal Credit Opportunity Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 21, 2018 |
Re-opened: | Mar 07, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 04, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 20, 2019 4:10 AM CDT |
Defendant
Glenn Duhon
|
|
Defendant
First Guaranty Bank, M.A.
|
|
Defendant
Patout & Son, Ltd, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Randall Romero
|
|
Plaintiff
Wenceslaus Provost, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 29 2019
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 7/26/19. (jrc) |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |