Edward Pruitt v. Life Insurance Company of North America
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-08204 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Sep 21, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 24, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 20, 2019 1:39 AM PDT |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Pruitt
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, January 24, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Dismissing Case
Thu 01/24 11:20 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE16 by Judge John F. Walter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action, is dismissed in its entirety as to all defendants, with prejudice. All dates set in this matter are vacated and taken off the Court's calendar. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs in this matter. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) |
|
Wednesday, January 23, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 01/23 5:13 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a) filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Blohm, Nicole) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | ||
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 11/13 12:14 PM
DEFENDANT LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICAS NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America, identifying Edward Pruitt; Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA)Defendant LINA is a corporation organized under the laws of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, having its principal place of business in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania; Connecticut General Corporation; Cigna Holdings, Inc.; and Cigna Corporation. (Ingram, Grant) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 11/13 11:49 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Blohm, Nicole) |
|
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Declaration
Mon 11/05 9:26 AM
DECLARATION of Phillip S. Bather (Lead Trial Counsel) re Efiling Compliance filed by Plaintiff Edward Pruitt. (Bather, Phillip) |
|
Saturday, November 03, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Declaration
Sat 11/03 12:33 PM
DECLARATION of Nicole Y. Blohm RE: LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Blohm, Nicole) |
|
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 10/25 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Courts Standing Order filed by Plaintiff Edward Pruitt. (Bather, Phillip) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 10/10 5:04 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 11/15/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Nicole Y Blohm added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Blohm, Nicole) |
|
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 09/26 2:02 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Edward Pruitt, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Damonte of C.T. Corporation Registered Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bather, Phillip) |
|
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 09/26 11:31 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) |
|
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 09/21 5:22 PM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint1 as to defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (esa) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 09/21 5:17 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 09/21 5:16 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 09/21 3:41 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff EDWARD PRUITT. (Bather, Phillip) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 09/21 3:38 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff EDWARD PRUITT, (Bather, Phillip) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 09/21 3:34 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff EDWARD PRUITT. (Bather, Phillip) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 09/21 3:32 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22464233 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff EDWARD PRUITT. (Attorney Phillip S Bather added to party EDWARD PRUITT(pty:pla))(Bather, Phillip) |