Mary B. Sharp et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Patricia Donahue |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-08208 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 21, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 20, 2019 2:02 AM PDT |
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Jim Vreeland Motors, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary B. Sharp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Will C. Sharp
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
transfer
Reassignment of Case Due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer (MJ) (G-74) - optional html form
Wed 03/13 1:03 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read as 2:18-cv-08208-AB-PDx. (cbr) |
|
Tuesday, September 21, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
order
Substitute Attorney
Tue 09/21 8:48 PM
ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Amir Nassihi for Defendants Ford Motor Company and Jim Vreeland Motors,Inc. dba Jim Vreeland Ford in place of Attorneys Warren E. Platt and Alina Mooradian10 . (gk) |
|
Monday, September 20, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Substitute Attorney (G-01)
Mon 09/20 6:55 PM
REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Amir Nassihi in place of attorney Alina Mooradian filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, Jim Vreeland Motors, Inc.. (Attorney Amir M Nassihi added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft), Attorney Amir M Nassihi added to party Jim Vreeland Motors, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Nassihi, Amir) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)
Wed 09/26 11:26 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-ml-02814 AB(FFMx). Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-08208 AB(FFMx). Signed by Judge Andre Birotte Jr (rn) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 09/24 10:16 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 09/24 10:16 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa) |
|
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 09/21 6:21 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jim Vreeland Motors, Inc., a California Corporation, identifying Jim Vreeland Motors, Inc. dba Jim Vreeland Ford. (Mooradian, Alina) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 09/21 5:50 PM
NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (MDL No. 2814-AB (FFMx)) filed by Defendants Ford Motor Company, Jim Vreeland Motors, Inc., a California Corporation.(Mooradian, Alina) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Transfer Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Conditional Transfer Orders No 1-5, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Amended Proof of Service | ||
4 | 4
trial
Jury Demand
Fri 09/21 5:43 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendants Ford Motor Company, Jim Vreeland Motors, Inc., a California Corporation.. (Mooradian, Alina) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 09/21 5:32 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, identifying State Street Corporation, Evercore Trust Company, N.A., BlackRock, Inc., The Vanguard Group. (Mooradian, Alina) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 09/21 5:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Ford Motor Company, Jim Vreeland Motors, Inc., a California Corporation. (Mooradian, Alina) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 09/21 5:20 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Barbara Superior Court, case number 18CV04115 Receipt No: 0973-22464653 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Ford Motor Company, Jim Vreeland Motors, Inc., a California Corporation. (Attorney Alina Mooradian added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft), Attorney Alina Mooradian added to party Jim Vreeland Motors, Inc., a California Corporation(pty:dft))(Mooradian, Alina) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Case Reassignment, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Ford's and Jim Vreeland Motors, Inc.'s Answer to Unverified Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Mooradian ISO Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Hugret ISO Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Luna ISO of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Ford's 2017 Form 10-K Filing | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 09/24 9:16 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Ford Motor Company, Jim Vreeland Motors, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiffs Mary B. Sharp, Will C. Sharp. (Filed in state court 8/21/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 09/24 9:20 AM
COPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL executed by Plaintiffs Mary B. Sharp, Will C. Sharp, upon Defendant Ford Motor Company served on 8/23/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service, by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Mon 09/24 9:22 AM
COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendants Ford Motor Company, Jim Vreeland Motors, Inc. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 3)(esa) |