USA v. Perez
California Eastern District Court | |
Case #: | 1:18-cr-00211 |
Case Filed: | Sep 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 22, 2018 12:51 AM PDT |
Defendant
Nikko Adolfo Perez (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/22/2018 12:59 AM PDT |
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 15 pgs COMPLAINT as to Nikko Adolfo Perez (1). (Flores, E) [1:18-mj-00156-SAB] | |
3 | 3 SHACKLING MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/12/2018: Pursuant to Local Rule 401, the Court hereby determined that the appropriate restraint level for Nikko Adolfo Perez is Legs Only (USM # 77620-097). (Hernandez, M) [1:18-mj-00156-SAB] | |
4 | 4 ARREST WARRANT RETURNED Executed on 09/12/2018 as to Nikko Adolfo Perez. (Flores, E) [1:18-mj-00156-SAB] | |
5 | 5 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone: INITIAL APPEARANCE RE CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Nikko Adolfo Perez held on 9/12/2018. Financial affidavit provided on behalf of the defendant. The court appoints counsel to represent the defendant in this case. The defendant is advised of the charges and rights, waived further reading and DENIED the allegations in the criminal complaint. True name stated as charged. Government seeks detention; defense request detention hearing - Defendant ordered TEMPORARILY DETAINED. Detention Hearing set for 9/13/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Preliminary Examination set for 9/26/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Government Counsel: David Gappa present. Defense Counsel: Erin Snider present. Custody Status: (C) LEGS ONLY. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO: Alice Timken. Pretrial Services: Elizabeth Gutierrez (Gonzales, V) [1:18-mj-00156-SAB] | |
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone: DETENTION HEARING as to Nikko Adolfo Perez held on 9/13/2018. Government seeks detention. Defense counsel argues for release. The Court orders the defendant DETAINED. Preliminary Hearing set for 9/26/2018 at 2:30pm before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe- Remains as previously set. Government Counsel: David Gappa present. Defense Counsel: Erin Snider present. Custody Status: (C) LEGS ONLY. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO: Otilia Rosales. (Gonzales, V) [1:18-mj-00156-SAB] | |
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 DETENTION ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/13/2018 as to Nikko Adolfo Perez. (Gonzales, V) [1:18-mj-00156-SAB] | |
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE of ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Eric Vincent Kersten appearing for Nikko Adolfo Perez. Attorney Kersten, Eric Vincent added. (Kersten, Eric) [1:18-mj-00156-SAB] | |
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
10 | 10 INDICTMENT as to Nikko Adolfo Perez (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (Sant Agata, S) | |
Att: 1 True Bill and Defendant Information Sheet |