Katherine Moussouris, et al v. Microsoft Corp.
Original Case: 2:15-cv-01483
Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:18-cv-35791 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Sep 21, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 24, 2019 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 27, 2019 12:41 AM PST |
Amicus Curiae
IMPACT FUND, EQUAL RIGHTS ADVOCATES, AND 33 OTHER ORGANIZATIONS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
RETAIL LITIGATION CENTER, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
CENTER FOR WORKPLACE COMPLIANCE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
HR POLICY ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
SOCIETY FOR HUMAN RESOURCE MANAGEMENT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
KATHERINE MOUSSOURIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
HOLLY MUENCHOW
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DANA PIERMARINI, on behalf of themselves and a class of those similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/27/2019 12:38 AM PST |
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 Filed order (MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH, Circuit Judges) in case no. 18-80080 on 9 20-2018 Petitioners’ motion for leave to file a reply in support of the petition for permission to appeal (Docket Entry No. 22) is granted. The Clerk shall file the reply submitted as an exhibit to Docket Entry No. 22. The court, in its discretion, grants the petition for permission to appeal the district court’s June 25, 2018 order denying class action certification. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(f); Chamberlan v. Ford Motor Co., 402 F.3d 952 (9th Cir. 2005). Within 14 days after the date of this order, petitioners shall perfect the appeal in accordance with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d). The motion to file the petition for leave to appeal (“Petition”), the order denying class certification (“Order”), and exhibits in Volume II (“Vol. II”) under seal (Docket Entry No. 2) is granted for the purposes of this petition. See Interim 9th Cir. R. 27-13. The Clerk shall maintain the Petition, the Order, and Vol. II under seal in this petition. This order neither seals nor unseals any documents which may be submitted in the perfected appeal. If petitioners or respondent move to seal documents in the perfected appeal, the party or parties on whose behalf sealing is sought shall: (1) In the new sealing motion or the response thereto, provide additional justification for sealing the following categories: “Confidential Human Resources Strategy;” “Confidential Diversity Initiatives, Strategy, and Representation;” and “Office of Federal Contract Compliance Programs.” See Resp. to Pet’rs’ Mot. to Seal at 9, 12. The additional justification should include case citations addressing these specific categories. (2) Include the chart attached to respondent’s Response to Petitioners’ Motion to Seal, see Resp. to Pet’rs’ Mot. to Seal, App. A, with the addition of a column providing the text that was redacted from the page at issue. (3) In any sealed document, highlight or underline the information that was redacted from the corresponding publicly filed document. The parties are reminded that “[t]his Court has a strong presumption in favor of public access to documents,” and any sealing motion “shall request the least restrictive scope of sealing.” See Interim 9th Cir. R. 27-13(a), (c). [11020568] (RT) [Entered: 09/21/2018 10:10 AM] | |
2 | 2 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/28/2018. Transcript ordered by 10/22/2018. Transcript due 11/19/2018. Appellants Katherine Moussouris, Holly Muenchow and Dana Piermarini opening brief due 12/31/2018. Appellee Microsoft Corporation answering brief due 01/31/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11020575] (RT) [Entered: 09/21/2018 10:14 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Mediation Letter | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Mediation Questionnaire | ||
Att: 3 9 pgs Case Opening Packet | ||
Att: 4 3 pgs Docketing Letter | ||
3 | 3 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 09/21/2018. [11020896] (KM) [Entered: 09/21/2018 12:23 PM] |