Doe et al v. Ladue Horton Watkins High School et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Ross |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-01637 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 20:1681 Title 9 of the Education Amendment Act of 1972 |
Case Filed: | Sep 26, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 25, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2019 4:57 AM CDT |
Defendant
Ladue Horton Watkins High School
1201 Warson Rd
Ladue, MO 63124 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ladue School District
9703 Conway Road
Ladue, MO 63124 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Andy Bresler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sheri Glantz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nancy Goldstein
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carolyn Jaeger
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sheldon Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeff Kopolow
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kisha Lee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
next friend of John Doe 22 Ladue Manor
Ladue, MO 63124 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe
by next friend Jane Doe 22 Ladue Manor
Ladue, MO 63124 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)
Thu 10/25 1:42 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to close the case based on Plaintiffs' notice.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/25/18. (KKS) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 10/10 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jane Doe, John Doe (Maddock, Paul) |
|
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
11
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Mon 10/01 4:02 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Jane Does, next fried of John Doe, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc.5 ), is DENIED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/1/18. (JAB) |
|
20 | 20
order
A Docket Text Order
Mon 10/01 1:01 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:18 MOTION to Seal Document Ex. 9 to Reply to Motion for TRO by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe. (Maddock, Paul) ; For good cause shown, ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/1/18. (JAB) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF)
Mon 10/01 10:14 AM
SEALED DOCUMENT re 17 Reply to Response to Motion, 18 MOTION to Seal Document Ex. 9 to Reply to Motion for TRO by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe . (Maddock, Paul) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Seal Document
Mon 10/01 10:13 AM
MOTION to Seal Document Ex. 9 to Reply to Motion for TRO by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe. (Maddock, Paul) |
|
Sunday, September 30, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Sun 09/30 5:03 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe. (Maddock, Paul) |
|
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
trial
Exhibit List
Fri 09/28 5:37 PM
CLERKS Exhibit List as to Motion Hearing. (CLO) |
|
15 | 15
trial
Witness List
Fri 09/28 5:36 PM
CLERKS WITNESS LIST as to Motion Hearing. (CLO) |
|
14 | 14
minutes
Motion Hearing
Fri 09/28 5:35 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John A. Ross: Motion Hearing held on 9/28/2018 re5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by John Doe, Jane Doe. Parties present for hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order5 . Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym2 and Motion for Appointment of Next Friend as to John Doe3 are granted with no objection from the Defendant's. Arguments heard and discussion held re: Motion for TRO5 . Matter taken under submission. Written order to issue. Exhibits received to be filed under seal. (Court Reporter:Lisa Paczkowski, Lisa_Paczkowski@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7985) (FTR Gold: No) (CLO) (Main Document 14 replaced on 9/28/2018) (CLO) |
|
13 | 13
15
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Fri 09/28 12:01 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendants Andy Bresler, Sheri Glantz, Nancy Goldstein, Carolyn Jaeger, Sheldon Johnson, Jeff Kopolow, Ladue Horton Watkins High School, Ladue School District, Kisha Lee. (Basi, Michelle) |
|
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Entry of Appearance
Thu 09/27 4:54 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Mandi Diane Moutray for Defendants Andy Bresler, Sheri Glantz, Nancy Goldstein, Carolyn Jaeger, Sheldon Johnson, Jeff Kopolow, Ladue Horton Watkins High School, Ladue School District, Kisha Lee. (Moutray, Mandi) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Entry of Appearance
Thu 09/27 4:52 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Celynda L. Brasher for Defendants Andy Bresler, Sheri Glantz, Nancy Goldstein, Carolyn Jaeger, Sheldon Johnson, Jeff Kopolow, Ladue Horton Watkins High School, Ladue School District, Kisha Lee. (Brasher, Celynda) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Entry of Appearance
Thu 09/27 4:48 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Michelle H. Basi for Defendants Andy Bresler, Sheri Glantz, Nancy Goldstein, Carolyn Jaeger, Sheldon Johnson, Jeff Kopolow, Ladue Horton Watkins High School, Ladue School District, Kisha Lee. (Basi, Michelle) |
|
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Thu 09/27 4:34 PM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiffs Jane and John Doe's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order5 is set for Friday, September 28, 2018, at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 12N. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on September 27, 2018. (MCB) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 09/27 2:47 PM
NOTICE Service of Notice of Request for Hearing on a TRO: by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe re5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Maddock, Paul) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 09/27 2:39 PM
NOTICE Service of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Motion: by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe re5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Maddock, Paul) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 09/27 2:19 PM
NOTICE REQUESTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe re5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (JWD) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Thu 09/27 2:15 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe.(Ernst, Edwin) Modified on 9/27/2018 (JWD) |
|
Att: 1 Notice Requesting Hearing on TRO, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of P. Maddock, | ||
Att: 3 Ex. 1, | ||
Att: 4 Ex. 2, | ||
Att: 5 Ex. 3, | ||
Att: 6 Ex. 4, | ||
Att: 7 Ex. 5, | ||
Att: 8 Ex. 6, | ||
Att: 9 Ex. 7, | ||
Att: 10 Ex. 8, | ||
Att: 11 Ex. 9, | ||
Att: 12 Ex. 10 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Entry of Appearance
Thu 09/27 11:12 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Paul A. Maddock for Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe. (Maddock, Paul) |
|
misc
Case Opening Notification
Thu 09/27 2:35 PM
Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (JWD) |
||
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appointment of Next Friend
Thu 09/27 8:37 AM
MOTION for Appointment of Next Friend as to John Doe. ; relationship to minor:mother by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe. (JWD) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Leave to
Thu 09/27 8:36 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe. (JWD) |
|
1 | 1
14
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/26 10:20 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-6780225, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Jane Doe, John Doe.(Ernst, Edwin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Motion to File Under Pseudonym, | ||
Att: 3 Motion for Appointment of Next Friend, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Summons - LHS, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Summons - District, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Summons - Board Member Lee, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Summons - Board Member Goldstein, | ||
Att: 8 Summons Summons - Board Member Bresler, | ||
Att: 9 Summons Summons - Board Member Kopolow, | ||
Att: 10 Summons Summons - Board Member Johnson, | ||
Att: 11 Summons Summons - Board Member Glantz, | ||
Att: 12 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, | ||
Att: 13 Affidavit Declaration of P. Maddock, | ||
Att: 14 Ex. 1 to Maddock Decl., | ||
Att: 15 Ex. 2 to Maddock Decl., | ||
Att: 16 Ex. 3 to Maddock Decl., | ||
Att: 17 Ex. 4 to Maddock Decl., | ||
Att: 18 Ex. 5 to Maddock Decl., | ||
Att: 19 Ex. 6 to Maddock Decl., | ||
Att: 20 Ex. 7 to Maddock Decl., | ||
Att: 21 Ex. 8 to Maddock Decl., | ||
Att: 22 Ex. 9 to Maddock Decl., | ||
Att: 23 Ex. 10 to Maddock Decl. |