United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Musk
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lewis J Liman |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-08865 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Thursday Feb 17, 2022 9:51 AM EST |
Defendant
Elon Musk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States Securities and Exchange Commission
100 F Street, N.E.
Washington, DC 20549 |
Represented By
|
1. | Federal judge sets April 4 hearing for Elon Musk contempt case (cnn.com) |
Submitted Wed 03/27/2019 | |
2. | Elon Musk circus enters a new arena: federal court (detroitnews.com) |
Submitted Mon 03/11/2019 | |
3. | Judge tells Tesla, SEC to justify lawsuit deal before settling (reuters.com) |
Submitted Thu 10/04/2018 | |
4. | Tesla Chief Elon Musk Is Sued by S.E.C. in Move That Could Oust Him (nytimes.com) |
Submitted Fri 09/28/2018 | |