California Northern District Court
Judge:Jon S Tigar
Case #: 4:18-cv-05929
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2019 1:58 AM PDT
Defendant
Apple, Inc.
Represented By
Alexander Bok-Sing Parker
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Alexander B Parker
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
David R. Eberhart
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Jesse Jon Koehler
Apple Inc.
contact info
Brian Merrill Cook
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel Thomas Jordan
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Darren Eastman
21446 Oneda Ct.
Los Gatos, CA 95033


Docket last updated: 03/27/2020 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
73 73 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Tue 03/17 1:02 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Pursuant to General Order 72, the case management conference currently scheduled for April 28, 2020, will proceed telephonically. No party need submit a request for telephonic appearance. Not later than 24 hours before the conference, the parties are ordered to email the courtroom deputy a conference call number at jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov. All counsel and/or parties representing themselves must be on the line at 2:00 p.m., ready to proceed when called. The Court usually schedules more than one case management conference at the same time, and thanks the parties and counsel in advance for their patience. (mllS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]