Adkins v. Facebook, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William Alsup |
Referred: | Jacqueline Scott Corley |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-05982 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2019 2:13 AM PDT |
Consol Plaintiff
Rebecca A King
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Connor Wiik
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Jasper Schmidt
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Robert E Newborn
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Angeles Meneses
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Joseph Melendez
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Kathi McGuire
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Dominique Martin
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Licea Luis
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Rubin K Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Hassan Elkassem
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Caryn Bendetowies
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
William Bass, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Facebook, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Scott Schinder, TX
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Derrick Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carla Echavarria
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 13, 2021 | ||
369 | 369
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/13 1:12 PM
ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) |
|
Sunday, July 11, 2021 | ||
368 | 368
misc
Transcript
Sun 07/11 8:55 AM
*** DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR (DUPLICATE SEE DOCKET # 367 ) *** Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/24/2021, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RMR, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/2/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/11/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2021. (rreS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/11/2021 (rjdS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Saturday, July 10, 2021 | ||
367 | 367
misc
Transcript
Sat 07/10 9:08 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/24/2021, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RMR, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/2/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/10/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/8/2021. (rreS, COURT STAFF) |