Shirley D. Webber Irrevocable Trust U/A dated March 12, 2003 et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Denise J Casper |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-12034 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 11, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2019 5:00 AM EDT |
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna W. Donovan
39 Mountain Ave.
Pembroke, MA 02359 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark E. Donovan
790 Huff Road NW Apt. 5011
Atlanta, GA 30318 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary E. Donovan
1 Canal Street Apt. 723
Boston, MA 02114 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew E. Donovan
428 E. 3rd Street
South Boston, MA 02127 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory M. Jaunich
2735 Forest Run Drive
Melbourne, FL 32935 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JoAnn W. Jaunich
2735 Forest Run Drive
Melbourne, FL 32935 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph A. Jaunich
767 Laurel Ave.
St. Paul, MN 55104 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kirk A. Jaunich
7017 Imlay Loop
Mountain Home, ID 83648 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley D. Webber 2007 Irrevocable Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley D. Webber Family LLC
300 E. Fearing Street
Elizabeth City, NC 27909 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley D. Webber Grandchildren's Irrevocable Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley D. Webber Irrevocable Insurance Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley D. Webber Irrevocable Trust U/A dated March 12, 2003
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley D. Webber
7521 Ensemble Lane
Melbourne, FL 32940 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 03/11 3:01 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Donna W. Donovan, Mark E. Donovan, Mary E. Donovan, Matthew E. Donovan, Gregory M. Jaunich, JoAnn W. Jaunich, Joseph A. Jaunich, Kirk A. Jaunich, Shirley D. Webber 2007 Irrevocable Trust, Shirley D. Webber Family LLC, Shirley D. Webber Grandchildren's Irrevocable Trust, Shirley D. Webber Irrevocable Insurance Trust, Shirley D. Webber Irrevocable Trust U/A dated March 12, 2003, Shirley D. Webber. (Panebianco, Anthony) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Letter/request - non-motion
Tue 03/05 5:13 PM
Response of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Providing Status of Settlement Letter/request (non-motion) from Attorney Becky L. Huinker (Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP) for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, NA . (Huinker, Becky) |
|
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 02/11 8:32 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to 3/5/19 to File Responsive Pleading (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 02/08 4:17 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to March 5, 2019 to File Responsive Pleading by Defendant by Donna W. Donovan, Mark E. Donovan, Mary E. Donovan, Matthew E. Donovan, Gregory M. Jaunich, JoAnn W. Jaunich, Joseph A. Jaunich, Kirk A. Jaunich, Shirley D. Webber 2007 Irrevocable Trust, Shirley D. Webber Family LLC, Shirley D. Webber Grandchildren's Irrevocable Trust, Shirley D. Webber Irrevocable Insurance Trust, Shirley D. Webber Irrevocable Trust U/A dated March 12, 2003, Shirley D. Webber.(Panebianco, Anthony) |
|
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 01/14 11:50 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to 2/13/19 (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 01/11 2:00 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 2/13/19 to File Responsive Pleading by Donna W. Donovan, Mark E. Donovan, Mary E. Donovan, Matthew E. Donovan, Gregory M. Jaunich, JoAnn W. Jaunich, Joseph A. Jaunich, Kirk A. Jaunich, Shirley D. Webber 2007 Irrevocable Trust, Shirley D. Webber Family LLC, Shirley D. Webber Grandchildren's Irrevocable Trust, Shirley D. Webber Irrevocable Insurance Trust, Shirley D. Webber Irrevocable Trust U/A dated March 12, 2003, Shirley D. Webber.(Panebianco, Anthony) |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 12/13 9:04 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to 1/13/19 to file a responsive pleading. (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 12/12 4:35 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to January 18, 2019 to To file responsive pleadings of defendant by Donna W. Donovan, Mark E. Donovan, Mary E. Donovan, Matthew E. Donovan, Gregory M. Jaunich, JoAnn W. Jaunich, Joseph A. Jaunich, Kirk A. Jaunich, Shirley D. Webber 2007 Irrevocable Trust, Shirley D. Webber Family LLC, Shirley D. Webber Grandchildren's Irrevocable Trust, Shirley D. Webber Irrevocable Insurance Trust, Shirley D. Webber Irrevocable Trust U/A dated March 12, 2003, Shirley D. Webber.(Panebianco, Anthony) |
|
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Tue 12/04 10:42 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Eric D. Martin. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McKillop, Matthew) |
|
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 12/03 2:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Eric D. Martin Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7437327 by Wells Fargo Bank.(Huinker, Becky) |
|
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 11/27 8:35 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to 12/18/18 (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 11/26 1:10 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to December 18, 2018 to File Responsive Pleading(s) by Donna W. Donovan, Mark E. Donovan, Mary E. Donovan, Matthew E. Donovan, Gregory M. Jaunich, JoAnn W. Jaunich, Joseph A. Jaunich, Kirk A. Jaunich, Shirley D. Webber 2007 Irrevocable Trust, Shirley D. Webber Family LLC, Shirley D. Webber Grandchildren's Irrevocable Trust, Shirley D. Webber Irrevocable Insurance Trust, Shirley D. Webber Irrevocable Trust U/A dated March 12, 2003, Shirley D. Webber.(Panebianco, Anthony) |
|
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 11/26 12:12 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donna W. Donovan, Kirk A. Jaunich, Shirley D. Webber Family LLC, JoAnn W. Jaunich, Joseph A. Jaunich, Shirley D. Webber Irrevocable Insurance Trust, Mark E. Donovan, Matthew E. Donovan, Shirley D. Webber, Shirley D. Webber Irrevocable Trust U/A dated March 12, 2003, Shirley D. Webber 2007 Irrevocable Trust, Mary E. Donovan, Gregory M. Jaunich, Shirley D. Webber Grandchildren's Irrevocable Trust. Wells Fargo Bank waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Panebianco, Anthony) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 11/26 11:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Becky L. Huinker on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank (Huinker, Becky) |
|
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 09/28 2:40 PM
Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Manolakis, Ashley) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/28 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Thomas Panebianco on behalf of Donna W. Donovan, Mark E. Donovan, Mary E. Donovan, Matthew E. Donovan, Gregory M. Jaunich, JoAnn W. Jaunich, Joseph A. Jaunich, Kirk A. Jaunich, Shirley D. Webber 2007 Irrevocable Trust, Shirley D. Webber Family LLC, Shirley D. Webber Grandchildren's Irrevocable Trust, Shirley D. Webber Irrevocable Insurance Trust, Shirley D. Webber Irrevocable Trust U/A dated March 12, 2003, Shirley D. Webber (Panebianco, Anthony) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 09/28 2:34 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/28 1:52 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7342766 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Donna W. Donovan, Mark E. Donovan, Mary E. Donovan, Matthew E. Donovan, Gregory M. Jaunich, JoAnn W. Jaunich, Joseph A. Jaunich, Kirk A. Jaunich, Shirley D. Webber 2007 Irrevocable Trust, Shirley D. Webber Family LLC, Shirley D. Webber Grandchildren's Irrevocable Trust, Shirley D. Webber Irrevocable Insurance Trust, Shirley D. Webber Irrevocable Trust U/A dated March 12, 2003, Shirley D. Webber.(Morgan, Jason) Modified on 9/28/2018 to edit name of Civil Cover Sheet in docket text (Manolakis, Ashley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit O, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit P, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit Exhibit R, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit Exhibit S, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit Exhibit T, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit Exhibit U, | ||
Att: 22 Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 23 Civil Cover Sheet |