Velez et al v. Wright National Flood Insurance Company
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sandra J Feuerstein |
Referred: | Arlene R Lindsay |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-00473 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 42:4072 Payment of Flood Insurance Claim |
Case Filed: | Jan 21, 2014 |
Terminated: | Dec 05, 2014 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 07, 2014 5:40 AM EST |
Defendant
Great Northern Insurance Company
|
|
Defendant
Wright National Flood Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Velez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gloria Velez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 89 minutes ago |
Tuesday, October 06, 2015 | ||
order
Stipulation and Order
Tue 10/06 9:20 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER re71 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Wright National Flood Insurance Company. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/6/2015. (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
Monday, October 05, 2015 | ||
71 | 71
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 10/05 10:10 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wright National Flood Insurance Company (Brenner, Theodore) |