Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Leo T Sorokin
Case #: 1:18-cv-12105
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2018
Terminated:Sep 13, 2019
Last checked: Thursday Apr 04, 2019 5:28 AM EDT
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant
Betsy DeVos
in her official capacity as U.S. Secretary of Education 400 Maryland Avenue, SW
Washington, DC 20202
Represented By
Rayford A. Farquhar
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cristen C. Handley
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Harvard Law Review
Gannett House 1511 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02138
Represented By
Chad Golder
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Ryan P. McManus
Hemenway & Barnes
contact info
Donald B. Verrilli, Jr.
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Sarah G. Boyce
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Michael P. Moore
Hemenway & Barnes
contact info
Dila Mignouna
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
President and Fellows of Harvard College
1350 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02138
Represented By
Paul R.Q. Wolfson
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Daniel Winik
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Felicia H. Ellsworth
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Seth P. Waxman
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Coalition for Meritocracy at Universities
Represented By
Jonathan F. Mitchell
Mitchell Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Faculty, Alumni, and Students Opposed to Racial Preferences
Represented By
Alexander K. Parachini
Donnelly, Conroy & Gelhaar, LLP
contact info
Jonathan F. Mitchell
Mitchell Law PLLC
contact info
George W. Vien
Donnelly, Conroy & Gelhaar, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Harvard Law School
Terminated: 02/05/2019
1563 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02138
Represented By
Paul R.Q. Wolfson
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Daniel Winik
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Felicia H. Ellsworth
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Seth P. Waxman
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 08 2019
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered.Because the plaintiffs have not alleged facts sufficient to establish associational standing or to plausibly state claims under Title VI, Title IX, or Ex parte Young, the defendants' motions to dismiss (Doc. Nos. 42, 44, and 46) are ALLOWED. The Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 33) is DISMISSED without prejudice.If the plaintiffs wish to file a second amended complaint remedying the deficiencies identified herein, they must seek leave to do so within thirty days of this Order. The plaintiffs shall attach a copy of their proposed second amended complaint to any such motion.If the plaintiffs move to amend their complaint, the defendants shall have thirty days to oppose the motion, with any reply by the plaintiffs due fourteen days after any oppositions are filed, and any surreplies by the defendants due fourteen days after the reply is filed. No further leave is required for the listed submissions. The reply and any surreplies shall be limited to five pages in length. In their briefs, the parties may address issues raised by the request for leave to amend as well as issues that might arise under Rule 12, so that the resolution of the motion for leave to amend will determine whether the proposed amended pleading provides a basis upon which to proceed with the lawsuit.(Motion seeking leave to file amended complaint due by 9/9/2019) (Montes, Mariliz)

Docket last updated: 03/24/2023 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, September 13, 2019
66 66 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 09/13 2:01 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. CLOSING ORDER DISMISSING CASE.(Montes, Mariliz)
Related: [-]