In Re: Zimmer M/L Taper Hip Prosthesis or M/L Taper Hip Prosthesis with Kinectiv Technology and Versys Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jesse M Furman |
Referred: | Debra C Freeman |
Case #: | 1:18-md-02859 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332t Diversity-Torts |
Case Filed: | Oct 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 14, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/21/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
624 | 624
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/12 4:11 PM
ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that no later than April 25, 2024, the parties shall file on ECF a joint letter, described below, updating the Court on the status of the case. The joint letter shall not exceed eight pages and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs: 1. A list of all member cases that remain to be litigated ("Live Cases"); 2. Whether any case other than the Live Cases that remains open can be closed (administratively or otherwise), specifically addressing the status of Sullens, which is open but has had no docket activity since July 13, 2022; 3. The status of the Master Settlement Agreement ("MSA"), including but not limited to the timing and process for dismissal of any not-yet-dismissed cases that are part of the MSA and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/12/24) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-JMF et al. (yv) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Fri 04/12 8:17 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Paul A. Crotty is no longer assigned to the case. (laq) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
623 | 623
transfer
MDL Order Reassigning Action
Fri 04/12 1:05 PM
CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF MDL ORDER REASSIGNING ACTION...that the action is reassigned to the Honorable Jesse M. Furman, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. (Signed by MDL Panel on 4/10/2024) (vba) |