Catalinbread LLC v. Gee et al
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Marco A Hernandez |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01795 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets |
Case Filed: | Oct 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 07, 2019 2:10 AM PDT |
Defendant
Michael Erickson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Howard Gee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott Miller
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Boris Lutkovsky
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Catalinbread LLC
405 SE 80TH AVE
Portland, OR 97215 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, October 10, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
2
pgs
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Case
Thu 10/10 4:27 PM
Stipulated Notice of Voluntary Dismissal By All Parties Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cronan, Aaron) |
|
Saturday, September 07, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
order
Protective Order
Mon 09/09 8:45 AM
Stipulated Protective Order. Signed on 9/7/2019 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
oth_doc
Proposed Order or Judgment
Thu 09/05 3:12 PM
Joint Proposed Form of Order Submitted Stipulated Protective Order . Filed by Michael Erickson. (Stride, Jon) |
|
39 | 39
motion
Protective Order
Thu 09/05 3:05 PM
Joint Motion for Protective Order Entry . Filed by Michael Erickson. (Stride, Jon) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Attorney Appearance
Wed 06/26 3:37 PM
Notice of Appearance of Eric J. Brickenstein appearing on behalf of Howard Gee, Boris Lutkovsky, Scott Miller Filed by on behalf of Howard Gee, Boris Lutkovsky, Scott Miller. (Brickenstein, Eric) |
|
37 | 37
notice
Attorney Appearance
Wed 06/26 1:15 PM
Notice of Appearance of Ashley H. Demland appearing on behalf of Catalinbread LLC Filed by on behalf of Catalinbread LLC. (Demland, Ashley) |
|
36 | 36
minute
Rule 16 Conference
Wed 06/26 12:48 PM
MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Telephone Conference held. The Court set the following case schedule: Discovery is to be completed by 1/6/2020. Dispositive Motions are due by 2/7/2020. Oral Argument is set for 4/20/2020 at 01:30PM in Portland Courtroom 15A before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Pretrial Conference is set for 8/10/2020 at 01:30PM in Portland Courtroom 15A before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Jury Trial is set for 8/18/2020 at 09:00AM in Portland Courtroom 15A before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Aaron J. Cronan present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Megan K. Houlihan present as counsel for defendant(s). Other counsel who appeared on the call shall file notices of appearance. Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Judge Marco A. Hernandez presiding. (jp) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
order
1 - Scheduling
Tue 06/18 2:08 PM
Scheduling Order by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. A Rule 16 Telephone Conference is set for 6/26/2019 at 10:30AM before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Counsel are required to confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. The Court directs the parties to submit a jointly proposed schedule to the courtroom deputy by email no later than Noon the day before the hearing (keeping in mind that Judge Hernandez expects civil cases to be tried within 18 months of the date of filing). The parties shall call into the Court's conference line (the phone number provided via separate email) five minutes prior to the scheduled conference time. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
4
pgs
oth_ans
Reply
Tue 05/28 2:01 PM
Reply To Defendants Miller, Gee, And Lutskovskys Counterclaims . Filed by Catalinbread LLC. (Cronan, Aaron) |
|
33 | 33
oth_ans
Reply
Tue 05/28 1:53 PM
Reply To Defendant Ericksons Counterclaims . Filed by Catalinbread LLC. (Cronan, Aaron) |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
17
pgs
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 05/14 2:28 PM
Answer to28 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand . Filed by Scott Miller, Howard Gee, Boris Lutkovsky. (Lundberg, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, May 07, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
16
pgs
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 05/07 2:28 PM
Answer to28 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses . Filed by Michael Erickson. (Stride, Jon) |
|
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition
Tue 05/07 9:56 AM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint29 . Response is due 5/14/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp) Modified on 5/7/2019 to reflect due date. NEF will be regnerated (jp) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition
Mon 05/06 11:44 AM
Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint28 . Filed by Scott Miller, Howard Gee, Boris Lutkovsky. (Lundberg, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
29
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)
Tue 04/23 8:25 PM
Second Amended Complaint . Filed by Catalinbread LLC against All Defendants. (Cronan, Aaron) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
15
pgs
order
Opinion and Order
Fri 04/12 12:46 PM
OPINION & ORDER: Defendants' motion to dismiss21 is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff is granted leave to amend the First Amended Complaint, consistent with the direction provided in the Opinion, within 14 days of the date below. If Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint within 14 days of the date below, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed on 4/12/2019 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Joinder Notice
Fri 03/08 3:54 PM
Notice of Joinder in Reply to Motion25 Filed by Michael Erickson. (Stride, Jon) |
|
25 | 25
resp
Reply to Motion
Fri 03/08 3:41 PM
Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 21 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Howard Gee, Boris Lutkovsky, Scott Miller. (Lundberg, Christopher) |
|
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
20
pgs
resp
Response to Motion
Fri 02/22 6:37 PM
Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 21 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Catalinbread LLC. (Cronan, Aaron) |
|
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Attorney Appearance
Tue 02/12 3:34 PM
Notice of Appearance of Megan K. Houlihan appearing on behalf of Michael Erickson Filed by on behalf of Michael Erickson. (Houlihan, Megan) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Joinder Notice
Fri 02/08 4:47 PM
Notice of Joinder in Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim21 Filed by Michael Erickson. (Stride, Jon) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 02/08 2:28 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Scott Miller, Howard Gee, Boris Lutkovsky. (Lundberg, Christopher) |
|
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
cmp
Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)
Fri 01/25 1:22 PM
First Amended Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages . Filed by Catalinbread LLC against All Defendants. (Cronan, Aaron) |
|
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
order
1 - Scheduling
Fri 01/18 1:37 PM
ORDER by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Based on email correspondence from counsel, the Court expects an Amended Complaint to be filed no later than 1/25/2019. Defendants' response to the Amended Complaint will be due under the appropriate time as set forth in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp) |
|
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
service
Waiver of Service Summons
Thu 12/20 8:40 PM
Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Scott Miller waiver sent on 11/19/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cronan, Aaron) |
|
17 | 17
service
Waiver of Service Summons
Thu 12/20 8:38 PM
Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Howard Gee waiver sent on 11/19/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cronan, Aaron) |
|
16 | 16
service
Acceptance/Acknowledgment of Service
Thu 12/20 8:35 PM
Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on Boris Lutkovsky served on 11/13/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cronan, Aaron) |
|
15 | 15
service
Acceptance/Acknowledgment of Service
Thu 12/20 5:00 PM
Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on Michael Erickson served on 11/5/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cronan, Aaron) |
|
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition
Fri 12/14 12:40 PM
ORDER issued by Judge Marco A. Hernandez: Granting Defendant Erickson's Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time13 as follows: Answer deadline reset to 1/18/2019 for Defendant Michael Erickson. (gm) |
|
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition
Wed 12/12 2:07 PM
Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (UNOPPOSED) Complaint,1 . Filed by Michael Erickson. (Stride, Jon) |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition
Tue 11/20 5:26 PM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer11 . Answer is due by 12/26/2018. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp) |
|
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition
Mon 11/19 2:31 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead . Filed by Michael Erickson. (Stride, Jon) |
|
Friday, October 19, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Fri 10/19 4:14 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment Summons | ||
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT
Wed 10/17 2:09 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (eo) |
|
8 | 8
service
Proposed Summons
Wed 10/17 11:50 AM
Proposed Summons Michael Erickson Filed by Catalinbread LLC. (Cronan, Aaron) |
|
7 | 7
service
Proposed Summons
Wed 10/17 11:47 AM
Proposed Summons Boris Lutksovsky Filed by Catalinbread LLC. (Cronan, Aaron) |
|
6 | 6
service
Proposed Summons
Wed 10/17 11:45 AM
Proposed Summons Howard Gee Filed by Catalinbread LLC. (Cronan, Aaron) |
|
5 | 5
service
Proposed Summons
Wed 10/17 11:43 AM
Proposed Summons Scott Miller Filed by Catalinbread LLC. (Cronan, Aaron) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT
Wed 10/10 9:58 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 2/7/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/11/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 3/11/2019. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (rs) |
|
3 | 3
oth_doc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 10/10 9:45 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Catalinbread LLC. (Cronan, Aaron) |
|
2 | 2
oth_doc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 10/10 9:35 AM
Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint,1 . Filed by Catalinbread LLC. (Cronan, Aaron) |
|
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 10/09 9:48 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5587516 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Catlinbread LLC against All Defendants. (Cronan, Aaron) |