UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. CVS HEALTH CORPORATION et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Richard J Leon |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-02340 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Oct 10, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 04, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2019 5:46 AM EDT |
Amicus
AIDS HEALTHCARE FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
CONSUMER ACTION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
PHARMACISTS SOCIETY OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
PHARMACISTS UNITED FOR TRUTH AND TRANSPARENCY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
U.S. PIRG
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AETNA INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STATE OF CALIFORNIA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STATE OF FLORIDA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STATE OF HAWAII
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STATE OF MISSISSIPPI
|
|
Plaintiff
STATE OF WASHINGTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
1. | Federal judge signs off on CVS-Aetna merger after post-deal review (modernhealthcare.com) |
Submitted Thu 09/05/2019 | |
2. | CVS, government urge federal judge to bless settlement pact (biopharmadive.com) |
Submitted Mon 06/24/2019 | |
3. | Federal judge sets June hearing for CVS purchase of Aetna (courant.com) |
Submitted Wed 05/15/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 10, 2019 | ||
139 | 139
misc
Sealed Document
Sun 10/06 6:02 PM
SEALED Third Report of the Monitoring Trustee filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons). (zjth) |
|
order
Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
Tue 09/10 2:14 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the United States'138 Motion to Place Report of Monitoring Trustee Under Seal, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to file the report of the monitoring trustee that is attached to the United States' September 6, 2019 motion [Dkt. # 138-4] under seal. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/10/2019. (lcrjl2) |
||
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
138 | 138
motion
Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
Fri 09/06 1:31 PM
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Owen, Jay) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Filing Under Seal, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Report of Monitoring Trustee | ||
Wednesday, September 04, 2019 | ||
137 | 137
order
.Order
Wed 09/04 4:27 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/4/2019. (lcrjl2) |
|
136 | 136
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Entry of Final Judgment
Wed 09/04 4:27 PM
ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, it is hereby ORDERED that the United States of America's57 Motion to Enter the Proposed Final Judgment is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the proposed Final Judgment, with the one modification described in the Memorandum Opinion, is ENTERED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/4/2019. (lcrjl2) |
|
135 | 135
22
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Wed 09/04 4:27 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/4/2019. (lcrjl2) |