Sheryl Tyson v. Life Insurance Company of North America
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Philip S Gutierrez |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-08834 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Oct 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 06, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2019 2:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheryl Tyson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 02/07 10:11 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case,15 : Based upon the stipulation of the parties and for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action, Case No. 2:18cv8834 PSG (JPRx), is dismissed in its entirety as to all defendants, with prejudice. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that each party shall bear its own attorneys fees and costs in this matter. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) |
|
Monday, February 04, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 02/04 4:46 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a) filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Heather E Horn added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Horn, Heather) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
attorney
Change of Address
Wed 12/19 9:46 AM
NOTICE of Change of address by Charles Kelechi Chineduh attorney for Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. Changing attorneys address to Meserve, Mumper & Hughes LLP, 1000 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1860, Los Angeles, California 90017-2457. Filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Chineduh, Charles) |
|
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Fri 12/07 3:44 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2019 at 02:00 PM. (wm) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 12/07 9:34 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America, identifying Life Insurance Company of North America ("LINA"), Connecticut General Corporation, Cigna Holdings,, Inc., Cigna Corporation. (Attorney Nicole Y Blohm added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Blohm, Nicole) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 12/07 9:32 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Chineduh, Charles) |
|
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 10/29 2:39 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 12/7/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Charles Kelechi Chineduh added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Chineduh, Charles) |
|
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 10/18 1:50 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sheryl Tyson, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro of C.T. Corporation Registered Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bather, Phillip) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 10/15 3:39 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 10/15 1:41 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 10/15 1:31 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 10/15 1:31 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 10/12 4:44 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Sheryl Tyson. (Bather, Phillip) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 10/12 4:43 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sheryl Tyson. (Bather, Phillip) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 10/12 4:42 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Sheryl Tyson, (Bather, Phillip) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 10/12 4:40 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22571588 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Sheryl Tyson. (Attorney Phillip S Bather added to party Sheryl Tyson(pty:pla))(Bather, Phillip) |