Biggs v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Carl Barbier |
Referred: | Joseph C Wilkinson, Jr |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-09514 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1333 Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 19, 2019 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2019 3:39 AM CDT |
Defendant
BP America Production Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BP Exploration & Production, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Demone Biggs
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 84 minutes ago |
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Receipt
Tue 02/19 4:17 PM
Receipt of Transfer Case to Southern District of Mississippi (my) |
|
6 | 6
order
Case Transferred Out - District
Tue 02/19 2:19 PM
ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/19/2019. (NEF: Sect J) (caa) |
|
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Statement
Mon 02/11 7:53 PM
Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 11/13 6:27 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) |
|
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
9
pgs
order
Order
Tue 10/16 11:49 AM
INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015.(cg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 BELO Settlement Agreement | ||
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 10/15 8:50 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) |
|
Sunday, October 14, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 10/14 11:37 AM
COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7170375) filed by Brandon Demone Biggs.Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Brandon Demone Biggs(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |