Sears Operations LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 7:18-bk-23538
Lead case is: 7:18-bk-23538
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Sean H Lane |
Case #: | 7:18-bk-23541 |
Case Filed: | Oct 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 11, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | Over 100,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,000,001 to $50 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Sears Operations LLC
3333 Beverly Rd
Hoffman Estates, IL 60179-0001 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago |
Wednesday, January 11, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
~Generic~ Order
Wed 01/11 4:43 PM
Order signed on 1/10/2023 (I) Entering Final Decree and Closing this Chapter 11 Case and (II) Granting Related Relief. (Tavarez, Arturo) |
|
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 01/11 4:44 PM
Case Closed. (Tavarez, Arturo) |
||
Sunday, July 03, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Mon 07/04 12:19 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 07/03/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, July 01, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Fri 07/01 1:22 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment From Judge Robert D. Drain to Judge Sean H. Lane. (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Fri 01/18 9:28 AM
Pending Deadlines TERMINATED: Schedules A/B, D, E/F, G and H, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Declaration Concerning Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs -- all filed. (Logue Togher, Claire) |
||
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Thu 01/17 8:28 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Filed by Jessica Liou on behalf of Sears Operations LLC. (Liou, Jessica) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Schedules
Thu 01/17 8:28 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule C - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Filed by Jessica Liou on behalf of Sears Operations LLC. (Liou, Jessica) |
|
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Thu 01/17 3:37 PM
Pending Deadlines TERMINATED: Schedule C -- not applicable to corporate debtors. (Logue Togher, Claire) |
||
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Tue 10/23 10:53 AM
This matter is jointly administered with Sears Holdings Corporation, 18 B 23538 (RDD) as the lead case. (Logue Togher, Claire) |
||
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
misc
Add Party
Wed 10/17 1:45 PM
Party Prime Clerk, LLC added to the case. (Vargas, Ana) |
||
misc
Case Association - Related
Wed 10/17 1:52 PM
Case Jointly Administered to: Sears Holdings Corporation (lead case 18-23538 ;Sears, Roebuck and Co. 18-23537 ;Kmart Holding Corporation 18-23539 ;Kmart Operations LLC 18-23540 ;ServiceLive, Inc. 18-23542 ;A&E Factory Service, LLC 18-23543 ;A&E Home Delivery, LLC 18-23544 ;A&E Lawn & Garden, LLC 18-23545 ;A&E Signature Service, LLC 18-23546 ;FBA Holdings Inc. 18-23547 ;Innovel Solutions, Inc. 18-23548 ;Kmart Corporation 18-23549 ;MaxServ, Inc. 18-23550 ; Private Brands, Ltd. 18-23551 ;Sears Development Co. 18-23552 ;Sears Holdings Management Corporation 18-23553 ;Sears Home & Business Franchises, Inc. 18-23554 ;Sears Home Improvement Products, Inc. 18-23555 ;Sears Insurance Services, L.L.C. 18-23556 ;Sears Procurement Services, Inc. 18-23557 ;Sears Protection Company 18-23558 ;Sears Protection Company (PR) Inc. 18-23559 ;Sears Roebuck Acceptance Corp. 18-23560 ;Sears, Roebuck de Puerto Rico, Inc. 18-23561 ;SYW Relay LLC 18-23562 ;Wally Labs LLC 18-23563 ; Big Beaver of Florida Development, LLC 18-23564 ;California Builder Appliances, Inc. 18-23565 ;Florida Builder Appliances, Inc. 18-23566 ;KBL Holding Inc. 18-23567 ;KLC, Inc. 18-23568 ;Sears Protection Company (Florida), L.L.C. 18-23569 ;Kmart of Washington LLC 18-23570 ;Kmart Stores of Illinois LLC 18-23571 ;Kmart Stores of Texas LLC 18-23572 ;MyGofer LLC 18-23573 ;Sears Brands Business Unit Corporation 18-23574 ;Sears Holdings Publishing Company, LLC 18-23575 ;Kmart of Michigan, Inc. 18-23576 ;SHC Desert Springs, LLC 18-23577 ;SOE, Inc. 18-23578 ;StarWest, LLC 18-23579 ;STI Merchandising, Inc. 18-23580 ;Troy Coolidge No. 13, LLC 18-23581 ;BlueLight.com, Inc. 18-23582 ;Sears Brands, L.L.C. 18-23583 ;Sears Buying Services, Inc. 18-23584 ;Kmart.com LLC 18-23585 and Sears Brands Management Corporation 18-23586 . (Vargas, Ana) |
||
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Motion, Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Tue 10/16 3:58 PM
Order signed on 10/16/2018 Granting Motion Extending Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and Statement of Financial Affairs . (Vargas, Ana) |
|
6 | 6
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Tue 10/16 3:55 PM
Order signed on 10/16/2018 Granting Motion Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases . (Vargas, Ana) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Motion, Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Mon 10/15 12:00 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information / Motion of Debtors for Entry of Order Extending Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and Statements of Financial Affairs filed by Ray C Schrock on behalf of Sears Operations LLC. (Schrock, Ray) |
|
4 | 4
30+
pgs
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Mon 10/15 11:58 AM
Motion for Joint Administration / Motion of Debtors for Entry of Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases filed by Ray C Schrock on behalf of Sears Operations LLC. (Schrock, Ray) |
|
3 | 3
ans
Declaration
Mon 10/15 8:38 AM
Declaration of Robert A. Riecker Pursuant to Rule 1007-2 of Local Bankruptcy Rules for Southern District of New York filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Sears Operations LLC. (Marcus, Jacqueline) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Mon 10/15 7:04 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement / Debtors' Consolidated Corporate Ownership Statement . Filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Sears Operations LLC. (Marcus, Jacqueline) |
|
1 | 1
18
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 10/15 1:56 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. . Schedule A/B due 10/29/2018. Schedule C due 10/29/2018. Schedule D due 10/29/2018. Schedule E/F due 10/29/2018. Schedule G due 10/29/2018. Schedule H due 10/29/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 10/29/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 10/29/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 10/29/2018, Filed by Jacqueline Marcus of Weil Gotshal & Manges, LLP on behalf of Sears Operations LLC. (Marcus, Jacqueline) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 10/15 6:19 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-23541 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12809707. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |