Member Case
Lead case is: 7:18-bk-23538

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert D Drain
Case #: 7:18-bk-23546
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of CreditorsOver 100,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $10,000,000,001 to $50 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
A&E Signature Service, LLC
3333 Beverly Rd
Hoffman Estates, IL 60179-0001
Represented By
Jacqueline Marcus
Weil Gotshal & Manges, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago
Friday, January 18, 2019
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Fri 10:06 AM
Pending Deadlines TERMINATED: Schedules A/B, D, E/F, G and H, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Declaration Concerning Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs -- all filed. (Logue Togher, Claire)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 17, 2019
10 10 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Thu 8:55 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Filed by Jessica Liou on behalf of A&E Signature Service, LLC. (Liou, Jessica)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Schedules Thu 8:53 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule C - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Filed by Jessica Liou on behalf of A&E Signature Service, LLC. (Liou, Jessica)
Related: [-]
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Thu 3:41 PM
Pending Deadlines TERMINATED: Schedule C -- not applicable to corporate debtors. (Logue Togher, Claire)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 23, 2018
misc Case Association - Joint Administration Tue 10:57 AM
This matter is jointly administered with Sears Holdings Corporation, 18 B 23538 (RDD) as the lead case. (Logue Togher, Claire)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 19, 2018
misc Add Claims and Noticing Agent Fri 7:51 PM
Claims and Noticing Agent, Prime Clerk, LLC, added to the case. (Logue Togher, Claire)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 17, 2018
8 8 notice ~Generic~ NOTICE Thu 12:25 PM
Case Joint Administration : Orders have been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases commenced by Sears Holdings Corporation (lead case 18 B 23538 (RDD)); Sears, Roebuck and Co. (18 B 23537 (RDD)); Kmart Holding Corporation (18 B 23539 (RDD)); Kmart Operations LLC (18 B 23540 (RDD)); Sears Operations LLC (18 B 23541 (RDD)); ServiceLive, Inc. (18 B 23542 (RDD)); A&E Factory Service, LLC (18 B 23543 (RDD)); A&E Home Delivery, LLC (18 B 23544 (RDD)); A&E Lawn & Garden, LLC (18 B 23545 (RDD)); A&E Signature Service, LLC (18 B 23546 (RDD)); FBA Holdings Inc. (18 B 23547 (RDD)); Innovel Solutions, Inc. (18 B 23548 (RDD)); Kmart Corporation (18 B 23549 (RDD)); MaxServ, Inc. (18 B 23550 (RDD)); Private Brands, Ltd. (18 B 23551 (RDD)); Sears Development Co. (18 B 23552 (RDD)); Sears Holdings Management Corporation (18 B 23553 (RDD)); Sears Home & Business Franchises, Inc. (18 B 23554 (RDD)); Sears Home Improvement Products, Inc. (18 B 23555 (RDD)); Sears Insurance Services, L.L.C. (18 B 23556 (RDD)); Sears Procurement Services, Inc. (18 B 23557 (RDD)); Sears Protection Company (18 B 23558 (RDD); Sears Protection Company (PR) Inc. (18 B 23559 (RDD)); Sears Roebuck Acceptance Corp. (18 B 23560 (RDD)); Sears, Roebuck de Puerto Rico, Inc. (18 B 23561 (RDD)); SYW Relay LLC (18 B 23562 (RDD)); Wally Labs LLC (18 B 23563 (RDD)); Big Beaver of Florida Development, LLC (18 B 23564 (RDD)); California Builder Appliances, Inc. (18 B 23565 (RDD)); Florida Builder Appliances, Inc. (18 B 23566 (RDD)); KBL Holding Inc. (18 B 23567 (RDD)); KLC, Inc. (18 B 23568 (RDD)); Sears Protection Company (Florida), L.L.C. (18 B 23569 (RDD)); Kmart of Washington LLC (18 B 23570 (RDD)); Kmart Stores of Illinois LLC (18 B 23571 (RDD)); Kmart Stores of Texas LLC (18 B 23572 (RDD)); MyGofer LLC (18 B 23573 (RDD)); Sears Brands Business Unit Corporation (18 B 23574 (RDD)); Sears Holdings Publishing Company, LLC (18 B 23575 (RDD)); Kmart of Michigan, Inc. (18 B 23576 (RDD)); SHC Desert Springs, LLC (18 B 23577 (RDD)); SOE, Inc. (18 B 23578 (RDD)); StarWest, LLC (18 B 23579 (RDD)); STI Merchandising, Inc. (18 B 23580 (RDD)); Troy Coolidge No. 13, LLC (18 B 23581 (RDD)); BlueLight.com, Inc. (18 B 23582 (RDD)); Sears Brands, L.L.C. (18 B 23583 (RDD)); Sears Buying Services, Inc. (18 B 23584 (RDD)); Kmart.com LLC (18 B 23585 (RDD)), Sears Brands Management Corporation (18 B 23586 (RDD)). Subject to further order of this Court, all further documents and entries shall be filed and made on the docket of Sears Holdings Corporation (18 B 23538 (RDD)). (Logue Togher, Claire).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 16, 2018
7 7 order Application, Extend Time to File Schedules Tue 4:10 PM
Order signed on 10/16/2018 Granting Motion Extending Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and Statement of Financial Affairs Related [+] . (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-] 5
6 6 order Motion, Joint Administration Tue 4:08 PM
Order signed on 10/16/2018 Granting Motion Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases Related [+]. (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-] 4
Monday, October 15, 2018
5 5 motion Application, Extend Time to File Schedules Mon 1:09 PM
Application to Extend Time to File Schedules / Motion of Debtors for Entry of Order Extending Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and Statements of Financial Affairs Related [+] filed by Ray C Schrock on behalf of A&E Signature Service, LLC. (Schrock, Ray)
Related: [-] 1
4 4 motion Motion, Joint Administration Mon 1:08 PM
Motion for Joint Administration / Motion of Debtors for Entry of Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases filed by Ray C Schrock on behalf of A&E Signature Service, LLC. (Schrock, Ray)
Related: [-]
3 3 ans Declaration Mon 8:43 AM
Declaration of Robert A. Riecker Pursuant to Rule 1007-2 of Local Bankruptcy Rules for Southern District of New York Related [+] filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of A&E Signature Service, LLC. (Marcus, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 7:10 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement / Debtors' Consolidated Corporate Ownership Statement . Related [+] Filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of A&E Signature Service, LLC. (Marcus, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 18 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 2:42 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. . Schedule A/B due 10/29/2018. Schedule C due 10/29/2018. Schedule D due 10/29/2018. Schedule E/F due 10/29/2018. Schedule G due 10/29/2018. Schedule H due 10/29/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 10/29/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 10/29/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 10/29/2018, Filed by Jacqueline Marcus of Weil Gotshal & Manges, LLP on behalf of A&E Signature Service, LLC. (Marcus, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Mon 6:19 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-23546 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12809707. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1