Price et al v. Think Finance, LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-33964
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-33964
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Harlin Dewayne Hale |
Case #: | 3:18-ap-03319 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Oct 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 22, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Think Finance, LLC
5080 Spectrum Drive Suite 700W
Addison, TX 75001 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Think Finance SPV LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TC Administrative Services, LLC
5080 Spectrum Drive Suite 700W
Addison, TX 75001 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tailwind Marketing, LLC
5080 Spectrum Drive Suite 700W
Addison, TX 75001 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
TC Loan Service, LLC
5080 Spectrum Drive Suite 700W
Addison, TX 75001 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
TC Decision Sciences, LLC
5080 Spectrum Drive Suite 700W
Addison, TX 75001 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tamara Price
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Hengle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Regina Nolte
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherry Blackburn
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
court
Close adversary case
Wed 01/22 3:51 PM
Adversary case 3:18-ap-3319 closed (Banks, Courtney) |
||
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of dismissal or stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding
Tue 01/21 4:12 PM
Notice of stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding filed by Plaintiffs Sherry Blackburn, George Hengle, Regina Nolte, Tamara Price. (Bartholow, Theodore) |
|
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document
Wed 02/27 11:35 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 02/27/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
order
Abate
Mon 02/25 1:08 PM
Order granting motion to abate scheduling order Entered on 2/25/2019. (Floyd, K) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Abate
Mon 02/25 9:41 AM
Motion to abate UNOPPOSED motion to abate deadlines in scheduling order pending completion of settlement negotiations filed by Plaintiffs Sherry Blackburn, George Hengle, Regina Nolte, Tamara Price Objections due by 3/18/2019. (Bartholow, Theodore) |
|
court
Hearing not held
Fri 03/01 12:32 PM
Hearing NOT held on 2/25/2019. (UNOPPOSED MOTION TO ABATE FILED.) (Green, Shanette) |
||
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
order
Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding
Mon 10/15 10:00 AM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call . Trial Docket Call date set for 2/25/2019 at 10:30 AM at Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm. Trial week 3/4/2019. Entered on 10/15/2018 (Bergreen, J.) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons issued
Mon 10/15 9:56 AM
Summons issued on TC Administrative Services, LLC Answer Due 11/14/2018; TC Decision Sciences, LLC Answer Due 11/14/2018; TC Loan Service, LLC Answer Due 11/14/2018; Tailwind Marketing, LLC Answer Due 11/14/2018; Think Finance SPV LLC Answer Due 11/14/2018; Think Finance, LLC Answer Due 11/14/2018 (Bergreen, J.) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 10/12 5:21 PM
Adversary case 18-03319 Complaint by Tamara Price, George Hengle, Regina Nolte, Sherry Blackburn against Think Finance, LLC, Think Finance SPV LLC, TC Administrative Services, LLC, Tailwind Marketing, LLC, TC Loan Service, LLC, TC Decision Sciences, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 14 . 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). (Bartholow, Theodore) |